Consolidated
Lead case: 3:25-md-03140

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Hope T Cannon
Case #: 3:25-cv-00192
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Feb 25, 2025
Case in other court:Georgia Middle, 4:25-cv-00048
Last checked: Friday Apr 11, 2025 6:13 AM EDT
Defendant
GREENSTONE LLC
Defendant
PFIZER INC
Defendant
PHARMACIA AND UPJOHN COMPANY LLC
Defendant
PHARMACIA LLC
Defendant
PRASCO LLC
Defendant
VIATRIS INC
Interested Party
JACOB WOODY
Plaintiff
TIFFANY STARLING
Represented By
JACK WALTER LURTON, III
Rafferty Domnick Cunningham & Yaffa
contact info
TROY ALAN RAFFERTY
Rafferty Domnick Cunningham & Yaffa
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/01 10:57 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by KATHERINE ANN KIZIAH on behalf of TIFFANY STARLING (KIZIAH, KATHERINE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
13 13 Case transferred in from District of Georgia Middle; Case Number 4:25-cv-00048. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Case Electronically Transferred Out - District Transfer to Northern District of Florida. All documents, including a certified copy of the docket sheet and pleading were transferred electronically. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**Case Transfer Acknowledgment deadline 3/11/2025. (esl) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 2/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
12 12 MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2) transferring proceedings to Northern District of Florida for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (esl) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 2/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
11 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TIFFANY STARLING as to GREENSTONE LLC. (CONLEY, CALE) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 2/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
10 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TIFFANY STARLING as to PFIZER INC. (CONLEY, CALE) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 2/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
9 9 PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE on behalf of TIFFANY STARLING Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-4874822, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Cale Conley GA Bar: 181080.(LURTON, JACK) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 2/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
Notice of Deficiency Related [+]: You must obtain a Certificate of Good Standing from a US District Court where you are admitted to practice. (The Certificate must be issued within 30 days of petition for admission.) State court certificates or letters from the State Bar are NOT accepted. (aen) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 2/25/2025.]
Related: [-] 9 Petition to the Clerk for Admission to Plead and Practice Pro Hac Vice, filed by TIFFANY STARLING
Notice of Deficiency Related [+]; Other - You must obtain a Certificate of Good Standing from a US District Court where you are admitted to practice. (The Certificate must be issued within 30 days of petition for admission.) State court certificates are NOT accepted. Upon refiling you may reach out to our finance department for reimbursement of duplicate admission fee.(ksl) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 2/25/2025.]
Related: [-] 9 Petition to the Clerk for Admission to Plead and Practice Pro Hac Vice, filed by TIFFANY STARLING
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
8 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TIFFANY STARLING as to VIATRIS INC. (CONLEY, CALE) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 2/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
7 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TIFFANY STARLING as to PRASCO LLC. (CONLEY, CALE) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 2/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
6 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TIFFANY STARLING as to PHARMACIA LLC. (CONLEY, CALE) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 2/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
5 5 Summons Returned Unexecuted by TIFFANY STARLING as to PFIZER INC. (CONLEY, CALE) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 2/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
4 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TIFFANY STARLING as to PHARMACIA AND UPJOHN COMPANY LLC. (CONLEY, CALE) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 2/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
3 3 NOTICE Correcting Civil Cover Sheet by TIFFANY STARLING re1 Complaint, (CONLEY, CALE) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 2/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
2 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Summons for PFIZER,(esl) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 2/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons for PFIZER GA,
Att: 2 Summons for VIATRIS,
Att: 3 Summons for GREENSTONE,
Att: 4 Summons for PRASCO,
Att: 5 Summons for PHARMACIA & UPJOHN,
Att: 6 Summons for PHARMACIA & UPJOHN GA,
Att: 7 Summons for PHARMACIA
Thursday, February 06, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT against TIFFANY STARLING Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-4862363, $405 filed by TIFFANY STARLING(CONLEY, CALE) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 2/25/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Greenstone LLC,
Att: 3 Summons Pfizer Inc,
Att: 4 Summons Pfizer Inc GA RA,
Att: 5 Summons Pharmacia and Upjohn Company LLC,
Att: 6 Summons Pharmacia and Upjohn Company LLC GA RA,
Att: 7 Summons Pharmacia LLC,
Att: 8 Summons Prasco LLC,
Att: 9 Summons Viatris Inc.