New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Natasha C Merle
Referred: Peggy Kuo
Case #: 1:25-cv-01034
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Case Filed:Feb 25, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 11, 2025 6:16 AM EDT
Defendant
Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company
1314 Douglas St # 1600
Omaha, NE 68102
Represented By
Anthony Michael Tessitore
Tressler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By
Michael E. Buckley
Usery & Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 04/30 2:26 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company. (Tessitore, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 04/07 9:59 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond by Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company (Tessitore, Anthony) Modified on 4/7/2025 to reflect this is a motion (RO)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/07 9:58 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Michael Tessitore on behalf of Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Tessitore, Anthony)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 04/07 2:50 PM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for defendant Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended nunc pro tunc to April 30, 2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 4/7/2025. (RO)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 03/19 8:19 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company served on 3/12/2025, answer due 4/2/2025. (Buckley, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
6 6 order Scheduling Order Tue 03/11 11:19 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference will be held in this case on June 13, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. before Peggy Kuo, United States Magistrate Judge in Courtroom 11C South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. Counsel are directed to the annexed Initial Conference Order for instructions. By June 6, 2025 , the parties must file a joint and completed copy of the [LINK:Proposed Discovery Plan] . Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to ensure that Defendant is aware of this conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 3/11/2025. (RO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
5 5 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Tue 02/25 3:41 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SDM)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Tue 02/25 3:40 PM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (SDM)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 02/25 3:39 PM
Summons Issued as to Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company. (SDM)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Tue 02/25 1:47 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (SMF)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 02/25 12:07 PM
COMPLAINT against Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18795619 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Buckley, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 02/25 3:37 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Natasha C. Merle and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (SDM)
Related: [-]