Connecticut District Court
Judge:Sarala V Nagala
Case #: 3:25-cv-00277
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Feb 25, 2025
Terminated:Mar 28, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 11, 2025 6:01 AM EDT
Defendant
BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc.
350 Campus Drive
Marlborough, MA 01752
Represented By
Michael D DeMeola
Boyle, Shaughnessy & Campo, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Colleen Audi
Represented By
Louis J. Martocchio
Martocchio & Oliveira LLC
contact info
Louis Joseph Martocchio, III
Martocchio & Oliveira, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, March 28, 2025
22 22 order Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Fri 03/28 5:01 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion to Remand to State Court, given the parties' stipulated agreement to remand the action to state court for further proceedings. The Clerk is directed to remand this action to Connecticut Superior Court immediately. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 3/28/2025. (Vo, C)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Fri 03/28 5:01 PM
ORDER denying as moot15 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint, given the parties' stipulation requesting to withdraw the motion. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 3/28/2025. (Vo, C)
Related: [-]
notice Judicial Evaluation Program Survey Fri 03/28 5:12 PM
JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Bergeson, S)
Related: [-]
utility Case Remanded to State Fri 03/28 5:13 PM
Case remanded to State Court Judicial District of New Britain. (Bergeson, S)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
20 20 misc Stipulation Thu 03/27 1:46 PM
STIPULATION by BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc.. (DeMeola, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
19 19 order Order Mon 03/10 10:49 AM
ORDER. In addition to responding to Plaintiff's motion for remand, Defendant shall also respond to Plaintiff's motion for leave to amend by March 28, 2025 . In its response, Defendant must address why Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(1)(B), which allows a party to amend its pleading once as a matter of course no later than 21 days after the service of a responsive pleading, would not apply here. See ISC Holding AG v. Nobel Biocare Fin. AG , 688 F.3d 98, 112 (2d Cir. 2012) Related [+]; Chartwell Therapeutics Licensing LLC v. Citron Pharma LLC , No. 16 CV 3181 (MKB) (CLP), 2019 WL 12518711, at *2-3 (E.D.N.Y. Nov. 20, 2019) (collecting cases standing for same proposition). Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 3/10/2025. (Vo, C)
Related: [-] cognizing that an answer is a responsive pleading
utility Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings Mon 03/10 2:07 PM
Set Deadlines as to15 First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint . Responses due by 3/28/2025 (Bergeson, S)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/07 3:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D DeMeola on behalf of BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc. (DeMeola, Michael)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Order Fri 03/07 3:12 PM
ORDER. The Court had ordered Attorney DeMeola to file his notice of appearance on the docket by March 3, 2025. To date, the notice of appearance has not been filed. By March 10, 2025 , Attorney DeMeola shall file his notice of appearance on the docket. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 3/7/2025. (Vo, C)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Remand to State Court Fri 03/07 2:23 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by Colleen Audi.Responses due by 3/28/2025(Martocchio, Louis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Motion for Leave to Amend
15 15 motion Leave to File Document Fri 03/07 2:21 PM
First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Colleen Audi. (Martocchio, Louis)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/07 2:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Louis Joseph Martocchio, III on behalf of Colleen Audi (Martocchio, Louis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Tue 03/04 9:45 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc..(DeMeola, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Fri 02/28 3:13 PM
NOTICE by BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc. re8 Electronic Service Documents,, Notice of Compliance with Standing Order Regarding Removed Cases (DeMeola, Michael)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Fri 02/28 2:28 PM
NOTICE by BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc. re 10 Order,, Notice of Pending Motions (DeMeola, Michael)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Order Fri 02/28 12:10 PM
ORDER. Upon review of the docket, the Court notes that Attorney DeMeola has not filed a notice of appearance on behalf of Defendant BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc. Additionally, under Paragraph 6 of the Court's Standing Order on Removed Cases, ECF No. 8-1, Defendant must also file a notice, entitled "Notice of Pending Motions," specifying any pending motions in this case that require action by this Court and attaching a true and complete copy of each such motion and all supporting and opposition papers. By March 3, 2025 , Defendant shall file the Notice of Pending Motions and Attorney DeMeola shall file a notice of appearance on the docket. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 2/28/2025. (Vo, C)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Order Fri 02/28 9:54 AM
ORDER. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 81(c)(2)(C), Defendant must answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint by March 4, 2025 . Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 2/28/2025. (Vo, C)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Deadline Fri 02/28 11:45 AM
Answer deadline updated for BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc. to 3/4/2025. (Bergeson, S)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
8 8 order Electronic Service Documents Wed 02/26 2:42 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines,1 Notice of Removal, filed by BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc.,7 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction,5 Electronic Filing Order, 3 Notice re: Disclosure Statement,6 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 2/26/2025.(Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
7 7 misc Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake) Wed 02/26 2:41 PM
Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Standing Protective Order (Intake) Wed 02/26 2:39 PM
Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 2/25/2025.(Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Electronic Filing Order Wed 02/26 2:33 PM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 1/25/2025.(Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order on Pretrial Deadlines Wed 02/26 2:25 PM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/28/2025 Discovery due by 8/27/2025 Dispositive Motions due by 10/1/2025 Signed by Clerk on 1/25/2025.(Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice re: Disclosure Statement Wed 02/26 10:47 AM
Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 2/25/2025.(Higgins, J.)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Disclosure Tue 02/25 3:24 PM
MOTION for Disclosure Rule 7.1 Disclosure by BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc.. (DeMeola, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 02/25 3:06 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc. from Connecticut Superior Court Judicial District of New Britain, case number NNB-CV25-6093507-S. Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACTDC-8077297, filed by BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc..(DeMeola, Michael)
Related: [-]
utility NEW Case Assignment Wed 02/26 10:56 AM
CASE ASSIGNMENT: District Judge Sarala V. Nagala assigned to the case. If the District Judge issues an Order of Referral to a Magistrate Judge for any matter other than settlement, the matter will be referred to Magistrate Judge Maria E. Garcia. (Freberg, B)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 02/26 2:54 PM
Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/10/2025 (Bergeson, S)
Related: [-]