White v. J R T Trucking Inc et al
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Jerry Edwards, Jr |
Referred: | Mark L Hornsby |
Case #: | 5:25-cv-00236 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.) |
Case Filed: | Feb 25, 2025 |
Terminated: | Apr 28, 2025 |
Case in other court: | 1st jdc, 654860 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 11, 2025 5:07 AM CDT |
Defendant
Tustin L Harp
|
|
Defendant
J R T Trucking Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tomorrow S White
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Monday, April 28, 2025 | ||
10 | 10
![]() ORDER granting9 Joint/Voluntary Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Jerry Edwards, Jr on 4/28/2025. (crt,Roaix, G) |
|
Thursday, April 24, 2025 | ||
9 | 9
![]() JOINT MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by All Parties. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/24/2025. (Attorney Connor Krone added to party Tustin L Harp(pty:dft))(aty,Krone, Connor) Modified docket text & indicate proposed order found in pdf of main document on 4/24/2025 (Miletello, A) |
|
Thursday, March 20, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
![]() RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by J R T Trucking Inc . (aty,Williams, Douglas) |
|
Tuesday, March 11, 2025 | ||
7 | 7
![]() DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by J R T Trucking Inc. (aty,Williams, Douglas) |
|
6 | 6
![]() CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by J R T Trucking Inc. (aty,Williams, Douglas) |
|
Thursday, February 27, 2025 | ||
5 | 5
![]() REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 2/27/2025. (crt,Keller, J) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/26/2025. (crt,Chavis, J) |
|
3 | 3
![]() NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement sent to Douglas Kent Williams, Edward Dion Young on behalf of Tomorrow S White, J R T Trucking Inc. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 3/12/2025. (crt,Chavis, J) |
|
2 | 2
![]() NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement sent to Douglas Kent Williams on behalf of J R T Trucking Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 3/12/2025. (crt,Chavis, J) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 02/26 11:24 AM
CASE Assigned to Judge Jerry Edwards, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Chavis, J) |
||
Tuesday, February 25, 2025 | ||
1 | 1
![]() NOTICE of Removal from 1st JDC Caddo Parish, Case Number 654860 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-6200246) filed by JRT Trucking, Inc..(Attorney Douglas Kent Williams added to party JRT Trucking, Inc.(pty:dft))(aty,Williams, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |