California Central District Court
Judge:John W Holcomb
Referred: Karen E Scott
Case #: 8:25-cv-00374
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Feb 25, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 11, 2025 3:24 AM PDT
Defendant
Alissa Emmel
Represented By
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Oil Appellate
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Jennifer B. Higgins
Represented By
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Oil Appellate
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Kristi Noem
Represented By
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Oil Appellate
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Oil Appellate
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
Thi Ngoc Lien Trinh
Represented By
Fredrick William Voigtmann
Law Office Of Fred Voigtmann PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
10 10 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Mon 04/28 12:36 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Alissa Emmel answer now due 5/29/2025; Jennifer B. Higgins answer now due 5/29/2025; Kristi Noem answer now due 5/29/2025; United States Citizenship and Immigration Services answer now due 5/29/2025, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Alissa Emmel; Jennifer B. Higgins; Kristi Noem; United States Citizenship and Immigration Services.(Attorney Christina Alejandra Marquez added to party Alissa Emmel(pty:dft), Attorney Christina Alejandra Marquez added to party Jennifer B. Higgins(pty:dft), Attorney Christina Alejandra Marquez added to party Kristi Noem(pty:dft), Attorney Christina Alejandra Marquez added to party United States Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft))(Marquez, Christina)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
9 9 service Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA Wed 03/26 1:36 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Thi Ngoc Lien Trinh, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to C. Veloz. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Ealy Asse. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Ally. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Voigtmann, Fredrick)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 03/03 12:09 PM
STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (pd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
7 7 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 02/26 3:01 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Alissa Emmel, Jennifer B. Higgins, Kristi Noem, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 02/26 2:57 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 02/26 2:57 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 02/25 2:29 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Thi Ngoc Lien Trinh, (Voigtmann, Fredrick)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Tue 02/25 2:26 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Thi Ngoc Lien Trinh. (Voigtmann, Fredrick)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 02/25 2:17 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Thi Ngoc Lien Trinh. (Voigtmann, Fredrick)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 02/25 2:02 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-39173365 - Fee: $405, filed by plaintiff Thi Ngoc Lien Trinh. (Attorney Fredrick William Voigtmann added to party Thi Ngoc Lien Trinh(pty:pla))(Voigtmann, Fredrick)
Related: [-]