Nevada District Court
Judge:Andrew P Gordon
Referred: Daniel J Albregts
Case #: 2:25-cv-00360
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Feb 25, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 11, 2025 4:14 AM PDT
Defendant
Oracle America, Inc.
Represented By
Kathryn Newman
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Brian Hertz
HKM Employment Attorneys 101 Convention Center Dr. Suite 600
Las Vegas, NV 89109
Represented By
Michael A. Arata
Hkm Employment Attorneys LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
17 17 10 pgs order Order on Stipulation ~Util - Case Stayed Wed 04/16 12:13 PM
ORDER granting14 Stipulation. Pursuant to the Parties' stipulation, and good cause being shown, the Court hereby orders that the proceedings in this action shall be stayed pursuant to 9 U.S.C. § 3, and this matter is ordered to arbitration in accordance with the Arbitration Agreement. Signed by Chief Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/16/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
16 16 5 pgs order Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/14 2:42 PM
ORDER granting9 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David Powell for Oracle America, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel; Signed by Chief Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/14/2025. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website[LINK:www.pacer.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
Related: [-]
15 15 5 pgs order Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/14 2:38 PM
ORDER granting10 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Sara Bodner for Oracle America, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel; Signed by Chief Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/14/2025. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website[LINK:www.pacer.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
14 14 motion Stipulation Fri 04/11 11:07 AM
STIPULATION STIPULATION TO ARBITRATE; [PROPOSED ORDER] re1 Complaint,, by Defendant Oracle America, Inc..(Newman, Kathryn) (other) (presiding)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
13 13 notice Notice Corrected Image/Document Fri 04/11 10:44 AM
NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re10 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, for attorney Sara R. Bodner, by Defendant Oracle America, Inc.. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Newman, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice Corrected Image/Document Fri 04/11 10:41 AM
NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re9 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, for attorney David A. Powell, Jr., by Defendant Oracle America, Inc.. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Newman, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
11 11 minord Minute Order Tue 03/25 11:09 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/25/2025. By Deputy Clerk: M. Johansen. Verified Petition does not comply with LR IA 11-2(a). Client signatures are missing from the Petition for defendant Oracle America, Inc.. Counsel is advised to remedy the deficiencies and refile Petition under the event Notice of Corrected Image linking to 9 and 10 by April 15, 2025. Failure to comply will result in denial of the Petition. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
10 10 motion Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition Mon 03/24 2:18 PM
MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Sara R. Bodner and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Kathryn C. Newman (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7995928) by Defendant Oracle America, Inc.. (Newman, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition Mon 03/24 2:16 PM
MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by David D. Powell Jr. and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Kathryn C. Newman (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7995914) by Defendant Oracle America, Inc.. (Newman, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
8 8 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 03/14 4:29 PM
ORDER granting7 Stipulation TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO FILE RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. Oracle America, Inc. answer due 4/16/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 3/13/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
7 7 motion Stipulation Wed 03/12 5:05 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO FILE RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT re1 Complaint,, by Defendant Oracle America, Inc.. (Newman, Kathryn) (extend) (answer)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 03/07 12:46 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Hertz re4 Summons Issued. Oracle America, Inc. served on 2/26/2025. (Arata, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
5 5 order Standing Order Wed 02/26 4:26 PM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink:[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 02/26 9:51 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Oracle America, Inc. re1 Complaint. (CAH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
3 3 notice ENE Notice Wed 02/26 9:46 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler will be the evaluating judge in this case. No ENE will be conducted in cases subject to arbitration. Parties to cases subject to mandatory arbitration, as well as parties who agree to arbitrate, must notify the Court of the same no later than 14 days after the date of this Notice. Failure to do so may result in sanctions. (CAH)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Interested Parties Tue 02/25 2:21 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Brian Hertz. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Arata, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/25 2:14 PM
COMPLAINT against Oracle America, Inc. (Filing fee $405 receipt number CNVDC-7967329) by Brian Hertz. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/7/2025. Proof of service due by 5/26/2025. (Arata, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Wed 02/26 9:45 AM
Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (CAH)
Related: [-]