Texas Western District Court
Judge:Fred Biery
Referred: Elizabeth S Chestney
Case #: 5:25-cv-00204
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Feb 25, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 11, 2025 6:18 AM CDT
Counter Defendant
Steadfast Asset Holdings, Inc.
Represented By
Natalie Friend Wilson
Langley & Banack, Inc
contact info
Counter Plaintiff
Chicago Title Insurance Company
Represented By
Patrick Clayton Joost
Fidelity National Law Group
contact info
Gregory Brewer
Fidelity National Financial
contact info
Tiffany R. Serbousek
Fidelity National Law Group
contact info
Counter Plaintiff
Reserve at Canyon Creek TIC 6, LLC
Represented By
Victoria Harrison
Dubois, Bryant & Campbell, LLP
contact info
William S. Rhea
Dubois, Bryant & Campbell, L.L.P.
contact info
Counter Plaintiff
Reserve at Canyon Creek TIC 5, LLC
Represented By
Victoria Harrison
Dubois, Bryant & Campbell, LLP
contact info
William S. Rhea
Dubois, Bryant & Campbell, L.L.P.
contact info
Counter Plaintiff
Reserve at Canyon Creek TIC 4, LLC
Represented By
Victoria Harrison
Dubois, Bryant & Campbell, LLP
contact info
William S. Rhea
Dubois, Bryant & Campbell, L.L.P.
contact info
Counter Plaintiff
Reserve at Canyon Creek TIC 3, LLC
Represented By
Victoria Harrison
Dubois, Bryant & Campbell, LLP
contact info
William S. Rhea
Dubois, Bryant & Campbell, L.L.P.
contact info
Counter Plaintiff
Reserve at Canyon Creek TIC 2, LLC
Represented By
Victoria Harrison
Dubois, Bryant & Campbell, LLP
contact info
William S. Rhea
Dubois, Bryant & Campbell, L.L.P.
contact info
Counter Plaintiff
Reserve at Canyon Creek TIC 1, LLC
Represented By
Victoria Harrison
Dubois, Bryant & Campbell, LLP
contact info
William S. Rhea
Dubois, Bryant & Campbell, L.L.P.
contact info
Counter Plaintiff
Fidelity National Title Insurance Company
Represented By
Patrick Clayton Joost
Fidelity National Law Group
contact info
Gregory Brewer
Fidelity National Financial
contact info
Tiffany R. Serbousek
Fidelity National Law Group
contact info
Defendant
Chicago Title Insurance Company
6900 Dallas Parkway, Suite 610
Plano, TX 75024
Represented By
Patrick Clayton Joost
Fidelity National Law Group
contact info
Gregory Brewer
Fidelity National Financial
contact info
Tiffany R. Serbousek
Fidelity National Law Group
contact info
Defendant
Reserve at Canyon Creek TIC 6, LLC
Represented By
Victoria Harrison
Dubois, Bryant & Campbell, LLP
contact info
William S. Rhea
Dubois, Bryant & Campbell, L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant
Reserve at Canyon Creek TIC 4, LLC
Represented By
Victoria Harrison
Dubois, Bryant & Campbell, LLP
contact info
William S. Rhea
Dubois, Bryant & Campbell, L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant
Reserve at Canyon Creek TIC 3, LLC
Represented By
Victoria Harrison
Dubois, Bryant & Campbell, LLP
contact info
William S. Rhea
Dubois, Bryant & Campbell, L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant
Reserve at Canyon Creek TIC 2, LLC
Represented By
Victoria Harrison
Dubois, Bryant & Campbell, LLP
contact info
William S. Rhea
Dubois, Bryant & Campbell, L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant
Reserve at Canyon Creek TIC 5, LLC
Represented By
Victoria Harrison
Dubois, Bryant & Campbell, LLP
contact info
William S. Rhea
Dubois, Bryant & Campbell, L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant
Reserve at Canyon Creek TIC 1, LLC
Represented By
Victoria Harrison
Dubois, Bryant & Campbell, LLP
contact info
William S. Rhea
Dubois, Bryant & Campbell, L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant
Fidelity National Title Insurance Company
6900 Dallas Parkway, Suite 610
Plano, TX 75024
Represented By
Patrick Clayton Joost
Fidelity National Law Group
contact info
Gregory Brewer
Fidelity National Financial
contact info
Tiffany R. Serbousek
Fidelity National Law Group
contact info
Plaintiff
Steadfast Asset Holdings, Inc.
Represented By
Natalie Friend Wilson
Langley & Banack, Inc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
18 18 order Scheduling Order Tue 04/29 2:44 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Report Deadline due by 2/20/2026, ADR Mediation Completed by 2/20/2026, Amended Pleadings due by 5/30/2025, Discovery due by 3/31/2026, Motions due by 5/15/2026,. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (vl)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Protective Order Tue 04/29 2:42 PM
CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (vl)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
16 16 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Tue 04/29 10:47 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/28/2025 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Zoom.)(rqr)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
15 15 answer Answer to Counterclaim Mon 04/21 6:14 PM
ANSWER to9 Amended Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Steadfast Asset Holdings, Inc..(Wilson, Natalie)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Mon 04/21 5:07 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Chicago Title Insurance Company. (Gilbert, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Mon 04/21 5:06 PM
Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by Chicago Title Insurance Company. (Gilbert, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) Mon 04/21 5:02 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Fidelity National Title Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Fidelity National Financial, Inc., Other Affiliate FNTG Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Fidelity National Title Group, Inc. for Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Gilbert, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) Mon 04/21 5:00 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Chicago Title Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Fidelity National Financial, Inc., Other Affiliate FNTG Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Fidelity National Title Group, Inc. for Chicago Title Insurance Company. (Gilbert, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
10 10 respoth Amended Answer to Complaint Mon 03/31 1:38 PM
AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff Steadfast Asset Holdings,Inc.'s Complaint by Chicago Title Insurance Company, Chicago Title Insurance Company, Fidelity National Title Insurance Company, Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Joost, Patrick)
Related: [-]
9 9 cmp Counterclaim Amended Answer to Complaint Mon 03/31 1:05 PM
AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff's Original Petition , COUNTERCLAIM against Steadfast Asset Holdings, Inc. by Reserve at Canyon Creek TIC 3, LLC, Reserve at Canyon Creek TIC 4, LLC, Reserve at Canyon Creek TIC 6, LLC, Reserve at Canyon Creek TIC 5, LLC, Reserve at Canyon Creek TIC 1, LLC, Reserve at Canyon Creek TIC 2, LLC. (Rhea, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
8 8 5 pgs order Order Setting/Resetting Initial Pretrial Conference Fri 03/21 4:40 PM
ORDER Setting Initial Pretrial Conference. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 4/28/2025 2:30 PM before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. Counsel for all parties are required to appear by Zoom for the conference.. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (rqr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
7 7 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 03/05 2:33 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (vl)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs order Order Wed 03/05 2:33 PM
COURT ADVISORY CONCERNING DISCOVERY AND OTHER MATTERS. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (vl)
Related: [-]
5 5 7 pgs order Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Sched Order Notice of Right to Consent to Magistrate Trial Wed 03/05 2:32 PM
Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order to theCourt within sixty days of the appearance of any defendant., Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge.. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (vl)
Related: [-]
4 4 5 pgs order Order Wed 03/05 2:30 PM
STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE FRED BIERY. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (vl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
3 3 misc Supplement to Wed 02/26 4:22 PM
SUPPLEMENT to1 Notice of Removal,,, JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet by Chicago Title Insurance Company, Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Joost, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
2 2 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 02/25 3:06 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick Clayton Joost on behalf of Chicago Title Insurance Company, Fidelity National Title Insurance Company (Joost, Patrick)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 02/25 2:42 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Fidelity National Title Insurance Company, Chicago Title Insurance Company (Filing fee $405 receipt number ATXWDC-19833431), filed by Fidelity National Title Insurance Company, Chicago Title Insurance Company.(Joost, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Exh. A - Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exh. B - Plaintiff's Original Petition,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exh. C - Defendants Reserve at Canyon Creek TIC 1, LLC, Reserve at Canyon Creek TIC 2, LLC, Reserve at Canyon Creek TIC 3, LLC, Reserve at Canyon Creek TIC 4, LLC, Reserve at Canyon Creek TIC 5, LLC, and Reserve at Canyon Creek TIC 6, LLCs Original Answer,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exh. D - Defendants Chicago Title Insurance Company and Fidelity National Title Insurance Companys Original Answer and Counterclaim,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exh. E - Docket Sheet,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exh F. - Defendants FNTIC and CTICs Articles of Incorporation
misc Remark (No Doc#) Tue 02/25 3:33 PM
Remark: spoke with filing attorney via email and telephone; the case was erroneously filed in the Austin Division and was intended to be filed in the San Antonio Division. This case can be copied to SA and the AU matter can be administratively closed. (kp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 03/04 8:30 AM
Case assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rqr)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to SA Mag Judge Tue 03/04 8:31 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (rqr)
Related: [-]