New York Southern District Court
Judge:Gregory H Woods
Case #: 1:25-cv-01606
Nature of Suit448 Civil Rights - Education
Cause42:2000d Federally Assisted Programs
Case Filed:Feb 25, 2025
Terminated:May 09, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 11, 2025 6:35 AM EDT
Defendant
Columbia University
Represented By
Gabrielle Tenzer
Hecker Fink LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Catherine Curran-Groome
Represented By
Jonathan Wallace
contact info
Plaintiff
Brandon Murphy
Represented By
Jonathan Wallace
contact info
Plaintiff
Aidan Parisi
Represented By
Jonathan Wallace
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
21 21 order Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed Fri 05/09 4:45 PM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL: Please take notice that the Plaintiffs, by their attorney Jonathan Wallace, voluntarily dismiss this action without prejudice pursuant to F.R.C.P. Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i), the defendant not having served an answer or a motion for summary judgment. Plaintiffs have voluntarily dismissed this case without prejudice pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 5/9/2025) (sgz)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 05/09 1:45 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) All Defendants. Document filed by Catherine Curran-Groome, Aidan Parisi, Brandon Murphy. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Wallace, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Memo Endorsement Fri 05/09 12:37 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:18 Letter filed by Catherine Curran-Groome, Brandon Murphy, Aidan Parisi. ENDORSEMENT: Application denied. Plaintiffs' counsel's conclusion is wrong. The case cited by Plaintiffs' counsel applied a prior version of Fed. R. Civ. P. 15 that permitted amendments as a matter of course "before being served with a responsive pleading." That version of the Rule was amended in 2009. E.g., Wright & Miller, 6 Fed. Prac. & Proc. Civ. § 1483 (3d ed.). Under the plain text of the current version of Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1), Plaintiffs are permitted to amend their complaint once as a matter of course within 21 days of serving it, or within 21 days after service of a responsive pleading or a motion under Rule 12(b), (e), or (f). Neither of those conditions applies here. See Dkt. No. 1. The "logic or justice" of adhering to the federal rules governing litigation in federal court should be readily apparent to Plaintiff's counsel. So too should the value of basing legal arguments to the Court on current, rather than long-outdated, law. The Court's March 27, 2025 order remains in full force and effect. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 5/9/2025) (sgz)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Letter Fri 05/09 10:42 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Jonathan Wallace dated May 9, 2025 re: Amended Complaint. Document filed by Catherine Curran-Groome, Brandon Murphy, Aidan Parisi..(Wallace, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
17 17 misc Letter Wed 04/02 5:18 PM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Gabrielle E. Tenzer and Jonathan Wallace dated April 2, 2025 re: proceeding before Magistrate Judge. Document filed by Columbia University..(Tenzer, Gabrielle)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
16 16 misc Notice of Filing Transcript Mon 03/31 7:35 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 3/27/2025 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Transcript Mon 03/31 7:34 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 3/27/2025 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Greenblum, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/21/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/1/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/30/2025..(McGuirk, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
14 14 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 03/28 9:22 AM
ORDER, The Court will hold a conference in this matter on June 2, 2025 at 4:00 p.m. to discuss Plaintiffs' anticipated proposed amended complaint. The conference will be held by telephone. The deadline for Plaintiffs to submit their proposed amended complaint is May 12, 2025. On the date on which Plaintiffs' proposed amended complaint is filed, the parties must file separately a joint letter that attaches a legal blackline showing changes between the anticipated amended complaint and the prior complaint. The joint letter must state whether Defendant consents to the filing of the proposed amended complaint. If Defendant does not consent, the joint letter must also set forth the parties' respective positions regarding whether Plaintiffs should be granted leave to file the proposed amended complaint. The deadline for Defendant to submit a pre-motion letter regarding any anticipated motion to dismiss is May 26, 2025. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the operative complaint is extended to May 26, 2025. Discovery in this matter is stayed pending briefing and resolution of Defendant's anticipated motion to dismiss. SO ORDERED. (Columbia University answer due 5/26/2025.)( Amended Pleadings due by 5/12/2025., Telephone Conference set for 6/2/2025 at 04:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 3/27/25) (yv)
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Thu 03/27 1:45 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/27/2025. (Court Reporter Present) (va)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
13 13 6 pgs misc Letter Thu 03/20 9:01 PM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Gabrielle E. Tenzer and Jonathan Wallace dated March 20, 2025 re: Preceding Initial Case Management Conference. Document filed by Columbia University..(Tenzer, Gabrielle)
Related: [-]
12 12 2 pgs order Order Thu 03/20 11:23 AM
ORDER...it is hereby ORDERED that the parties must discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. § 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If both parties consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, counsel for the defendant must, within two weeks of the date of this order file on ECF a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, a copy of which is attached to this order (and also available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf). The executed form should be filed on ECF as a "Proposed Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge," and be described using the Proposed Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge" filing event in accordance with ECF Rule 13.27. If the Court approves that form, all further proceedings will then be conducted before the assigned Magistrate Judge rather than before me. Any appeal would be taken directly to the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, as it would be if the consent form were not signed and so ordered. If either party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter, within two weeks of the date of this order advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 3/20/2025) (sgz)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/20 8:36 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Wallace on behalf of Catherine Curran-Groome, Brandon Murphy, Aidan Parisi..(Wallace, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
10 10 service Certificate of Service Other Mon 03/03 4:38 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Dkt 7, Dkt 8 and Dkt 9 served on Jonathan Wallace on March 3, 2025. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Columbia University..(Tenzer, Gabrielle)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 03/03 9:35 AM
ORDER granting5 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application granted. Defendant's request for an extension of the deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint, Dkt. No. 5, is granted. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to May 5, 2025. SO ORDERED. Columbia University answer due 5/2/2025. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 2/28/2025) (mml)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 03/03 9:30 AM
ORDER: This action was removed from the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York, on February 25, 2025. Dkt. No. 1. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 81(c)(3), if any party wishes to demand a jury trial in this matter, the demand must be served and filed no later than March 11, 2025. Additionally, counsel for Plaintiffs is directed to promptly file a notice of appearance in this case. Counsel for Defendant is directed to serve a copy of this order on Plaintiff, and to retain proof of service. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 2/28/2025) (mml)
Related: [-]
7 7 3 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Mon 03/03 9:28 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/27/2025 at 12:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. The conference will be conducted by telephone. The parties are directed to the Court's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases, which are available on the Court's website. Rule 2 of the Court's Individual Rules contains the dial-in number for the conference and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of the Court's Individual Rules, as further set forth. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 2/28/2025) (mml)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Certificate of Service Other Fri 02/28 6:45 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Consent Letter Motion for an Extension of Time (ECF 5). Document filed by Columbia University..(Tenzer, Gabrielle)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 02/28 3:30 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to the complaint addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Gabrielle E. Tenzer dated February 28, 2025. Document filed by Columbia University..(Tenzer, Gabrielle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 02/26 10:02 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 02/26 10:13 AM
Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 02/26 10:14 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
4 4 service Certificate of Service Other Tue 02/25 9:22 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal (ECF 1), Civil Cover Sheet (ECF 2), and Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement (ECF 3) served on Jonathan Wallace on February 25, 2025. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Columbia University..(Tenzer, Gabrielle)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 02/25 5:48 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Columbia University..(Tenzer, Gabrielle)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 02/25 5:46 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Tenzer, Gabrielle)
Related: [-]
1 1 4 pgs notice Notice of Removal Tue 02/25 5:11 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 650605/2025. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30673180).Document filed by Columbia University..(Tenzer, Gabrielle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - NY Supreme Court Summons & Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - NY Supreme Court Affirmation of Service