New Hampshire Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kimberly Bacher
Case #: 1:25-bk-10098
Case Filed:Feb 25, 2025

Debtor
MSI Global Talent Solutions, LLC
44 Timber Swamp Rd
Hampton, NH 03842-1706
Represented By
William J. Amann
Amann Burnett, PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee
James C. Cleveland Building 53 Pleasant Street Suite 2300
Concord, NH 03301


Docket last updated: 02/26/2025 12:03 AM EST
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (CH. 7) (ACTIVE EVENT) Tue 02/25 2:34 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by MSI Global Talent Solutions, LLC Statement of Financial Affairs due by 03/11/2025. Schedule A/B due 03/11/2025. Schedule C due by 03/11/2025. Schedule D due by 03/11/2025. Schedule E/F due 03/11/2025. Schedule G due by 03/11/2025. Schedule H due by 03/11/2025. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 03/11/2025. Declaration re Debtor Schedules due by 03/11/2025. Atty Disclosure Statement due by 03/11/2025. Debtor Organizational Documents due by 03/11/2025. List of Inventory or Equipment due by 03/11/2025. Statement of Parent/Public Companies due by 03/11/2025. Incomplete Filings due by 03/11/2025. (Amann, William)Modified on 2/25/2025 to remove incorrect deadlines (jel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Corporate Vote
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Receipt for Fees Paid via Credit/Debit Card (ADI) Tue 02/25 2:36 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition - Chapter 7([LINK 25-10098 ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) filing fee. Receipt number A4283465, Fee amount $ 338.00. Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
3 3 misc Verification of Creditor Mailing List Tue 02/25 2:37 PM
Verification of Creditor Mailing List Filed by Debtor MSI Global Talent Solutions, LLC (Amann, William)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc List of Creditors in Matrix Format Tue 02/25 3:53 PM
List of Creditors in Matrix Format with Verification Filed by Debtor MSI Global Talent Solutions, LLC (Amann, William)
Related: [-]