North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:Terrence W Boyle
Referred: Kimberly A Swank
Case #: 5:25-cv-00096
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1443(1) Rent, Lease & Ejectment
Case Filed:Feb 21, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 07, 2025 5:26 AM EDT
Defendant
Dawn Lynette Mangum
50 Bunker Lane
Louisburg, NC 27549
Plaintiff
The State of North Carolina


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
utility Motion Referred Tue 03/18 10:35 AM
Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank regarding3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Edwards, S.)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
6 6 notice Document Sun 03/09 4:26 PM
Document: Notices - Notice of Default and Dishonor to Public Defender filed by Dawn Lynette Mangum. (Stouch, L.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Automatic Stay and Lack of Jurisdiction
Friday, February 21, 2025
5 5 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Tue 02/25 1:29 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Dawn Lynette Mangum. (Edwards, S.)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Document Tue 02/25 1:28 PM
Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet filed by Dawn Lynette Mangum. (Edwards, S.)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 02/25 1:26 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Dawn Lynette Mangum. (Edwards, S.)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Self-Representation Tue 02/25 1:24 PM
Notice of Self-Representation filed by Dawn Lynette Mangum. (Edwards, S.)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 02/25 1:23 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Pro Se) by Dawn Lynette Mangum from In The General Court of Justice Superior Court Division Wake, North Carolina, case number 24CR406656-910., filed by Dawn Lynette Mangum. (Edwards, S.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Copy of Judgment/Order,
Att: 2 Copy of Motion and Order Appointing Forensic Evaluator,
Att: 3 Copy of Affidavit,
Att: 4 Copy of Affidavit of Fact,
Att: 5 Copy of Appearance Bond for Pretrial Release,
Att: 6 Copy of Certificate of Service,
Att: 7 Copy of Conditions of Release and Order,
Att: 8 Copy of Declaration from the Dawn Lynette Mangum Estate,
Att: 9 Copy of Indictment,
Att: 10 Copy of Judgment/Order,
Att: 11 Copy of Motion and Order Appointing Forensic Evaluator,
Att: 12 Copy of Motion for Extension of Time,
Att: 13 Copy of Motion to Compel,
Att: 14 Copy of Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 15 Copy of Motion to Remove Court-Appointed Counsel,
Att: 16 Copy of Motion to Stay,
Att: 17 Copy of Notice of Distress,
Att: 18 Copy of Notice of Intent-Fee Schedule,
Att: 19 Copy of Notice of Special Appearance,
Att: 20 Copy of Petition to Proceed As An Indigent,
Att: 21 Copy of Protection Order and Motion for Dismissal,
Att: 22 Copy of Revocation of Power of Attorney,
Att: 23 Copy of Bill of Particulars,
Att: 24 Civil Cover Sheet