South Carolina District Court
Judge:Mary Geiger Lewis
Case #: 3:25-cv-01069
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Feb 24, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 11, 2025 7:18 AM EDT
Defendant
Riley Pope & Laney, LLC
Represented By
Cara Y Crotty
Constangy Brooks Smith And Prophete Llp (sc)
contact info
Joseph A McNelis, III
Constangy Brooks Smith Prophete Llp (pa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Jason Warren
Represented By
Paul J Doolittle
Poulin Willey Anastopoulo LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
17 17 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 05/05 5:11 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Related [+] Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 5/5/2025.(cbru, )
Related: [-] sponse to Motion due by 5/27/2025, Reply due the earlier of 21 days from the filing of Plaintiff's Response or 6/17/2025
16 16 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 05/05 12:28 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Jason Warren. Response to Motion due by 5/19/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Doolittle, Paul) Modified to edit motion relief on 5/5/2025 (cbru, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
15 15 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Wed 04/30 4:21 PM
Amended Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Riley Pope & Laney, LLC.(Crotty, Cara)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
14 14 order Mediation Order Tue 04/29 2:03 PM
MEDIATION ORDER. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 4/29/2025. (cbru, )
Related: [-]
13 13 order Scheduling Order Tue 04/29 2:02 PM
CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Report due by 6/2/2025, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 6/27/2025, Plaintiff ID of Expert Witness due by 7/28/2025, Defendant ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 8/26/2025, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 8/26/2025, Discovery due by 10/27/2025, Motion in Limine due by 2/9/2026, Motions due by 11/10/2025, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 1/23/2026, Jury Selection Deadline 3/2/2026, Mediation Due by 1/8/2026. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 4/29/2025. (cbru, )
Related: [-]
12 12 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 04/29 2:00 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed Defendant's 11 answers to the Local Civil Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, and determines the answer to Interrogatory H to be unresponsive in that Defendant fails to provide information necessary to determine the citizenship of Defendant which is a limited liability company ("LLC"). Citizenship of an LLC is determined based on the citizenship of its members, not based on a "state of incorporation" and principal place of business. See General Technology Applications, Inc. v. Exro Ltda, 388 F.3d 114 (4th Cir. 2004). Defendant shall file amended, responsive answers no later than May 6, 2025. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories due by 5/6/2025) Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 4/29/2025. (cbru, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
11 11 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Mon 04/28 4:14 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Riley Pope & Laney, LLC.(Crotty, Cara)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 04/28 4:12 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Response to Motion due by 5/12/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. ) by Riley Pope & Laney, LLC.No proposed order.(Crotty, Cara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo in Support
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed - Complaint Served Tue 03/18 2:17 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason Warren. Riley Pope & Laney, LLC served on 3/7/2025, answer due 4/28/2025.(Doolittle, Paul) Modified to edit text on 3/18/2025 (cbru, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service
Monday, March 17, 2025
8 8 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/17 11:19 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 3/17/2025.(cbru, )
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
7 7 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 03/14 4:05 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint. (Riley Pope & Laney, LLC answer due 4/28/2025) Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 3/14/2025.(cbru, )
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (only one attorney per motion) Fri 03/14 2:18 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph A. McNelis III (Filing fee $350 receipt number ASCDC-12326188) by Riley Pope & Laney, LLC. Response to Motion due by 3/28/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Crotty, Cara) Modified to edit text on 3/14/2025 (cbru, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Application/Affidavit,
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing PA,
Att: 3 Certificate of Good Standing NJ,
Att: 4 Proposed Order
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 03/14 10:27 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Riley Pope & Laney, LLC. Response to Motion due by 3/28/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Crotty, Cara)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 02/25 11:15 AM
Summons Issued as to Riley Pope & Laney, LLC. (cbru, )
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
3 3 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Tue 02/25 11:11 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Jason Warren.(cbru, ) (Main Document 3 replaced on 2/25/2025) (cbru, ).
Related: [-]
1 1 30+ pgs cmp Complaint Tue 02/25 11:07 AM
COMPLAINT against Riley Pope & Laney, LLC (Filing fee $405 receipt number ASCDC-12284429) filed by Jason Warren. Service due by 5/27/2025(cbru, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 2/25/2025) (cbru, ).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Sample Breach Notice,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Breach Notice