Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Katherine A Constantine
Case #: 3:25-bk-30538
Case Filed:Feb 25, 2025

Debtor
HOPE DENTAL CLINIC
800 MINNEAHAHA AVE E SUITE 465
Saint Paul, MN 55106
Represented By
John D. Lamey, III
Lamey Law Firm, P.A.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
1015 US Courthouse 300 S 4th St
Minneapolis, MN 55415


Docket last updated: 02/26/2025 12:08 AM CST
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
crditcrd none Tue 02/25 8:10 PM
Receipt of Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition([LINK 25-30538 ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A13875573. Fee amount 338.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
misc Add creditor to matrix Tue 02/25 8:16 PM
List of Creditors load 18 creditors added (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
court Notice of Deadline to Appoint Patient-Care Ombudsman Tue 02/25 9:41 PM
NOTICE RE: APPOINTMENT OF PATIENT-CARE OMBUDSMAN This case was filed on 02/25/2025 and designated as a healthcare business. Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 333(a)(1), the court will order the appointment of a patient-care ombudsman on 03/27/2025 unless an objection to such appointment is filed on or before 03/17/2025 and served as required by Local Rule 9013-2. The objection shall include notice of a hearing to be held on or before 03/27/2025. (admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition Tue 02/25 8:06 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals re: HOPE DENTAL CLINIC. Fee Amount $338.00. Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 03/27/2025 (Lamey, John)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Notice of Responsibilities of Chapter 7 Debtors and Their Attorneys Tue 02/25 8:06 PM
Notice of Responsibilities of Chapter 7 Debtors and Their Attorneys. (Lamey, John)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Tue 02/25 8:08 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Related [+] filed by HOPE DENTAL CLINIC. There is no parent corporation or publicly held corporation to report for HOPE DENTAL CLINIC. (Lamey, John)
Related: [-] 1