California Southern District Court
Case #: 2:25-mj-08124
Case Filed:Feb 24, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 25, 2025 11:23 PM PST
Defendant
Fortina Laura Vasquez-Mendoza (1)
Represented By
Mario Vela
Vela And Galvan, Attorneys At Law, Apc
contact info
Julie A Blair
Law Offices
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Anna Sebastian
Doj-Usao
contact info
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/26/2025 12:02 AM PST
Sunday, February 23, 2025
Arrest of Fortina Laura Vasquez-Mendoza (no document attached) (ccc)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Fortina Laura Vasquez-Mendoza. (Copies provided to Counsel in Court). Initial Appearance set for 2/24/2025 in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr. Preliminary Hearing set for 3/6/2025 10:00 AM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr. Arraignment set for 3/20/2025 10:00 AM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr.(ccc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Rap Sheet
2 2 ORDER as to Fortina Laura Vasquez-Mendoza: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr on 2/24/2025. (acc)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORAL MOTION to Detain by USA as to Fortina Laura Vasquez-Mendoza. (no document attached) (acc)
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr:Initial Appearance as to Fortina Laura Vasquez-Mendoza held on 2/24/2025. Oral proffer accepted. Attorneys Julie A Blair and co-counsel Mario Vela for Fortina Laura Vasquez-Mendoza. Preliminary Hearing set for 3/6/2025 at 10:00am before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr. Arraignment set for 3/20/2025 at 10:00am before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr.; Detention Hearing as to Fortina Laura Vasquez-Mendoza held on 2/24/2025. USA oral motion for detention - Denied. Bond set as to Fortina Laura Vasquez-Mendoza (1) $15,000 PS secured by 1 FRRA and 10% cash deposit. As required by Rule 5(f), the US is ordered to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions, including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges and contempt proceedings.(Interpreter Maria Cruz). (CD# 2/24/2025 LR 25 1:57-2:21). (Plaintiff Attorney Anna Sebastian AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Bacilio Varela FD). (no document attached) (acc)
Related: [-]
5 5 ***Spanish Interpreter needed as to Fortina Laura Vasquez-Mendoza (no document attached) (acc)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Fortina Laura Vasquez-Mendoza (1) $15,000 PS secured by 1 FRRA and 10% cash deposit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr on 2/24/2025. (acc)
Related: [-]