Texas Eastern District Court
Case #: 1:25-mj-00017
Case Filed:Feb 24, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 26, 2025 1:17 AM CST
Defendant
Nicole Boyett (1)
Represented By
David Wesley Barlow
Office Of The Federal Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jonathan Lee
Us Attorney'S Office - Beaumont
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/26/2025 1:50 AM CST
Monday, February 24, 2025
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Nicole Boyett Initial Appearance - Rule 5 set for 2/25/2025 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm 1 (Beaumont) before Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson. (ttp)
Related: [-]
TEXT ONLY ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER David Wesley Barlow for Nicole Boyett. Issued by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 2/24/2025. (ttp)
Related: [-]
1 1 Fed. R. Crim. P. 5, 32.1, or 40 Appearance papers (After all docketing is complete, clerk will notify charging district of EDTX proceedings using the Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer event.) as to Nicole Boyett (1). (ttp)
Related: [-]