California Central District Court
Judge:Andre Birotte Jr
Referred: Pedro V Castillo
Case #: 8:25-cv-00337
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2025
Terminated:Apr 04, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 05, 2025 3:46 AM PDT
Defendant
Shari L. Freidenrich
Plaintiff
Lenka Koloma
7395 El Camino Real No. 402
Atscadero, CA 93422


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
13 13 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Thu 05/01 2:53 PM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Lenka Koloma. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
12 12 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 04/18 10:11 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lenka Koloma, upon Defendant Shari L. Freidenrich served on 4/14/2025, answer due 5/5/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Shari L. Freidenrich in compliance with statute not specified by personal service. (hr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
11 11 service Summons Issued Fri 04/11 2:59 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - Related [+]1 as to Defendant Shari L. Freidenrich. (san)
Related: [-] ferred
Friday, April 04, 2025
10 10 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Wed 04/09 8:57 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Plaintiff has neither paid the filing fee nor filed a Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees as instructed in the Court's Order2 within the deadline set therein. Therefore, as stated in that Order, this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
9 9 motion Seal Case Mon 03/24 5:24 PM
SEALED - PETITION to Seal Case filed by plaintiff Lenka Koloma. (bm)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Fri 03/21 1:23 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE of "Suit in Chancery"; "Notice of Judge Assignment", filed by Plaintiff Lenka Koloma, served on 3/10/25. (hr)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
7 7 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Fri 03/14 3:01 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Filed Document RE: Letter6 . The following error(s) was/were found: Other error(s) with document(s): Local Rule 83-2.5 no letters to the Judge. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (et)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Letter Fri 03/14 2:59 PM
Letter from Plaintiff Lenka Koloma. (et)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
5 5 misc For Judicial Notice Wed 03/05 10:42 AM
MANDATORY JUDICIAL NOTICE; Claimant's Right to Court Access Without Fees (Proposed To Be Filed Under Seal) filed by Plaintiff Lenka Koloma. (hr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form Tue 02/25 2:00 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (sh)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
3 3 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Tue 02/25 1:57 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Filed Document RE: Complaint - Related [+]1 . The following error(s) was/were found: Other error(s) with document(s): No Civil Cover Sheet included with Complaint. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (sh)
Related: [-] ferred
Thursday, February 20, 2025
2 2 notice Notice Re: Discrepancies in Filing of Civil Rights Complaint (CV-93) Tue 02/25 1:56 PM
Notice Re: Discrepancies in Filing of Civil Rights Complaint (CV-93). Upon submission of your civil rights complaint, it was noted that you did not pay the appropriate filing fee. If you are unable to pay the entire filing fee at this time, you must sign and complete the Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support form (CV-60) attached. You may return your fee waiver and/or payment to any of the Courthouses listed on this notice. If you do not respond within THIRTY DAYS from the date below, your action may be dismissed. Re: Complaint - Related [+]1 (sh)
Related: [-] ferred
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint - (Referred) Tue 02/25 1:54 PM
COMPLAINT filed against Defendant Shari L. Freidenrich Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo., filed by Plaintiff Lenka Koloma. (sh)
Related: [-]