Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Ivan Lr Lemelle
Referred: Michael North
Case #: 2:25-cv-00386
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Feb 26, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 12, 2025 7:06 AM CDT
Defendant
Lenore Stockman
Plaintiff
Savings Bank Mutual Life Insurance Company of Massachusetts
Represented By
George Davidson Fagan
Leake & Andersson, Llp (new Orleans)
contact info
Jessica A Longacre
Leake & Andersson
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Thursday, April 10, 2025
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/10 11:45 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; Lenore Stockman served on 4/9/2025, answer due 4/30/2025.(Fagan, George) Modified text on 4/10/2025 (pp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service
Friday, February 28, 2025
4 4 misc Statement of Corporate Disclosure Fri 02/28 8:18 AM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Savings Bank Mutual Life Insurance Company of Massachusetts identifying Corporate Parent The Savings Bank Mutual Life Insurance Company of Massachusetts for Savings Bank Mutual Life Insurance Company of Massachusetts (Longacre, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 02/27 8:57 AM
Summons Issued as to Lenore Stockman. (gla)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
2 2 misc Initial Case Assignment Wed 02/26 10:30 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 02/26 10:03 AM
COMPLAINT against Lenore Stockman (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10900137) filed by The Savings Bank Mutual Life Insurance Company of Massachusetts.Attorney Jessica A Longacre added to party The Savings Bank Mutual Life Insurance Company of Massachusetts(pty:pet).(Longacre, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons