New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jeannette A Vargas
Case #: 1:25-cv-01615
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1114 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Feb 26, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 12, 2025 6:31 AM EDT
Defendant
Aaron Hakimian
Represented By
Arvind Jayakumar
Jayakumar Law
contact info
Defendant
Rugs America Corp.
Represented By
Arvind Jayakumar
Jayakumar Law
contact info
Defendant
Rugs America Holdings LLC
Represented By
Arvind Jayakumar
Jayakumar Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Hearst Communications, Inc.
300 West 57th Street
New York, NY 10019
Represented By
Tal S. Benschar
Koffsky Schwalb LLC
contact info
Matthew Roffman Greenfield
Hearst Corporation
contact info
Ravi Viren Sitwala
Hearst Corporation
contact info
Plaintiff
Hearst Magazine Media, Inc.
Represented By
Tal S. Benschar
Koffsky Schwalb LLC
contact info
Matthew Roffman Greenfield
Hearst Corporation
contact info
Ravi Viren Sitwala
Hearst Corporation
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, May 22, 2025
33 33 misc Letter Thu 05/22 10:36 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Jeannette A. Vargas from Tal S. Benschar dated May 22, 2025 re: Informing Court of intent to oppose motion to dismiss. Document filed by Hearst Communications, Inc., Hearst Magazine Media, Inc...(Benschar, Tal)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 19, 2025
32 32 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 05/19 12:23 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Aaron Hakimian, Rugs America Holdings LLC..(Jayakumar, Arvind)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
31 31 8 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Mon 05/12 2:44 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:29 MOTION to Dismiss Rugs America Corp. from the Breach of Contract Cause of Action . . Document filed by Aaron Hakimian, Rugs America Corp., Rugs America Holdings LLC..(Jayakumar, Arvind)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Original Licensing Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - First Amendment,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Second Amendment
30 30 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Mon 05/12 2:43 PM
DECLARATION of Arvind Jayakumar, Esq. in Support re:29 MOTION to Dismiss Rugs America Corp. from the Breach of Contract Cause of Action .. Document filed by Aaron Hakimian, Rugs America Corp., Rugs America Holdings LLC..(Jayakumar, Arvind)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint
29 29 motion Dismiss Mon 05/12 2:43 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Rugs America Corp. from the Breach of Contract Cause of Action . Document filed by Aaron Hakimian, Rugs America Corp., Rugs America Holdings LLC. Responses due by 5/27/2025.(Jayakumar, Arvind)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order granting Defendants' motion to dismiss
Thursday, May 08, 2025
adr Notice of Mediator Assignment Thu 05/08 11:49 AM
NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 6/9/2025.(sge)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
28 28 order Mediation Referral Order Tue 05/06 4:37 PM
MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is referred for mediation to the Court-annexed Mediation Program. The parties are hereby notified that Local Rule 83.9 shall govern the mediation and are directed to participate in the mediation in good faith. The mediation will haveno effect upon any scheduling Order issued by this Court without leave of this Court. SO ORDERED. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 5/20/2025. (Signed by Judge Jeannette A. Vargas on 5/6/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
27 27 order Case Management Plan Tue 05/06 4:34 PM
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c). The parties have conferred pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). Settlement discussions have taken place. Counsel for the parties believe the following alternative dispute resolution mechanisms may be helpful in resolving this case: Immediate referral to the District's Mediation Program. Any motion for leave to amend or join additional parties shall be filed no later than June 5, 2025. Depositions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30 and 31 shall be completed by the date set forth in paragraph 5(a). The parties do not anticipate requiring expert discovery. This case is to be tried to a jury. SO ORDERED. Motions due by 6/5/2025. Deposition due by 9/12/2025. Fact Discovery due by 9/12/2025. Estimate length of trial 3 days. (Signed by Judge Jeannette A. Vargas on 5/6/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Tue 05/06 1:28 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeannette A. Vargas: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 5/6/2025. Present were Tal Benschar, Matthew Greenfield, and Ravi Sitwala for the plaintiffs and Arvind Jayakumar for the defendants. (Court Reporter Rebecca Forman) (nmo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
26 26 misc Letter Tue 04/29 9:55 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Jeannette A. Vargas from Tal S. Benschar dated April 29, 2025 re: Joint Letter Submitting Case Management Plan. Document filed by Hearst Communications, Inc., Hearst Magazine Media, Inc...(Benschar, Tal)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Case Management Plan
Sunday, March 30, 2025
25 25 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Sun 03/30 11:46 PM
ORDER granting24 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Rugs America Corp. answer due 5/12/2025; Rugs America Holdings LLC answer due 5/12/2025 (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jeannette A. Vargas)(Text Only Order) (Vargas, Jeannette)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
24 24 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 03/28 5:57 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Document Responsive to the Complaint addressed to Judge Jeannette A. Vargas from Arvind Jayakumar, Esq. dated March 28, 2025. Document filed by Aaron Hakimian, Rugs America Corp., Rugs America Holdings LLC..(Jayakumar, Arvind)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Order Fri 03/28 4:24 PM
ORDER regarding ECF No. 22. Pursuant to Paragraph 3.E of this Court's Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases, requests for adjournments or extensions of time must be filed on ECF as letter-motions. The parties shall submit a letter-motion in conformity with the requirements set forth in Paragraphs 3A. and 3.E. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jeannette A. Vargas) (Text Only Order) (Yin-Olowu, Tammy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
22 22 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Wed 03/26 4:01 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Rugs America Corp., Rugs America Holdings LLC..(Jayakumar, Arvind)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/26 3:27 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Arvind Jayakumar on behalf of Aaron Hakimian, Rugs America Corp., Rugs America Holdings LLC..(Jayakumar, Arvind)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
20 20 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 03/19 10:15 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Aaron Hakimian waiver sent on 3/13/2025, answer due 5/12/2025. Document filed by Hearst Magazine Media, Inc. ; Hearst Communications, Inc...(Benschar, Tal)
Related: [-]
19 19 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Wed 03/19 10:13 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Rugs America Holdings LLC served on 3/11/2025, answer due 4/1/2025. Service was accepted by NY Secretary of State. Document filed by Hearst Magazine Media, Inc. ; Hearst Communications, Inc...(Benschar, Tal)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Wed 03/19 10:12 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Rugs America Corp. served on 3/11/2025, answer due 4/1/2025. Service was accepted by NY Secretary of State. Document filed by Hearst Magazine Media, Inc. ; Hearst Communications, Inc...(Benschar, Tal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
17 17 3 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Tue 03/04 6:10 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Counsel for all parties shall appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on May 6, 2025, at 10:30am. The conference will be held in Courtroom 14C, Daniel Patrick Moynihan United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007. All counsel must also familiarize themselves with the Court's Individual Rules, which are available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jeannette-vargas. Counsel are directed to confer with each other prior to the conference regarding settlement and each of the other subjects to be considered at a Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16 conference. Additionally, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file on ECF a joint letter, described below, as well as a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order attached as an exhibit to the joint letter, by April 29, 2025. The parties shall use this Court's form Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order, which is available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jeannette-vargas. Any open legal issues can be addressed at the conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jeannette A. Vargas on 3/4/2025) Initial Conference set for 5/6/2025 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 14C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jeannette A. Vargas. (ar)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
16 16 1 pgs misc AO 120 Form Trademark - Case Opening - Submitted Thu 02/27 9:38 AM
AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(jgo)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Summons Issued Thu 02/27 9:38 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Rugs America Holdings LLC..(jgo)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Issued Thu 02/27 9:37 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Rugs America Corp...(jgo)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Issued Thu 02/27 9:37 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Aaron Hakimian..(jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 02/27 9:32 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jeannette A. Vargas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 02/27 9:36 AM
Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 02/27 9:36 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
12 12 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 02/26 4:53 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The Hearst Corporation for Hearst Magazine Media, Inc.. Document filed by Hearst Magazine Media, Inc...(Benschar, Tal)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 02/26 4:52 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The Hearst Corporation for Hearst Communications, Inc.. Document filed by Hearst Communications, Inc...(Benschar, Tal)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/26 12:41 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Roffman Greenfield on behalf of Hearst Magazine Media, Inc., Hearst Communications, Inc...(Greenfield, Matthew)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/26 12:40 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ravi Viren Sitwala on behalf of Hearst Magazine Media, Inc., Hearst Communications, Inc...(Sitwala, Ravi)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 02/26 10:21 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Aaron Hakimian, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Hearst Magazine Media, Inc., Hearst Communications, Inc...(Benschar, Tal)
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 02/26 10:20 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Rugs America Holdings LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Hearst Magazine Media, Inc., Hearst Communications, Inc...(Benschar, Tal)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 02/26 10:19 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Rugs America Corp., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Hearst Magazine Media, Inc., Hearst Communications, Inc...(Benschar, Tal)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 02/26 10:13 AM
FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Hearst Magazine Media, Inc...(Benschar, Tal) Modified on 2/26/2025 (lb)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 02/26 10:12 AM
FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Hearst Communications, Inc...(Benschar, Tal) Modified on 2/26/2025 (lb)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney Wed 02/26 10:11 AM
AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Benschar, Tal)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 02/26 10:08 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Benschar, Tal)
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 02/26 10:07 AM
COMPLAINT against Aaron Hakimian, Rugs America Corp., Rugs America Holdings LLC. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30675418)Document filed by Hearst Magazine Media, Inc., Hearst Communications, Inc...(Benschar, Tal)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 02/26 11:43 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Tal S. Benschar to RE-FILE Document Nos. 4 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement and 5 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. These filings are deficient for the following reason(s): the corporate parent/other affiliate was not added;. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes or No radio button - If Yes - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time. (lb)
Related: [-]