Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:John M Gallagher
Case #: 5:25-cv-01001
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause15:5(a) Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Feb 26, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 12, 2025 6:43 AM EDT
Defendant
LEVAN MACHINE CO., INC.
Plaintiff
ERIC DEMUN
Represented By
KYLE H. STEENLAND
The Workers' Rights Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
6 6 order Stipulation and Order Wed 05/07 4:03 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER DEFENDANT'S TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FILED ON OR ABOUT FEBRUARY 26, 2025 IS EXTENDED FROM MAY 9, 2025 TO JUNE 9, 2025, ETC. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 5/7/25. 5/7/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 03/10 1:35 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ERIC DEMUN. LEVAN MACHINE CO., INC. waiver sent on 3/10/2025, answer due 5/9/2025. (STEENLAND, KYLE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Thu 02/27 12:06 PM
NOTICE by ERIC DEMUN re Attorney Required Forms, COMPLETED DESIGNATION FORM (STEENLAND, KYLE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 02/26 1:30 PM
Summons Issued as to LEVAN MACHINE CO., INC. Forwarded To: Counsel on 2/26/25 (er)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Notice Re: Magistrate Consent Wed 02/26 11:17 AM
Opt In Notice of Procedure to Consent to Random Magistrate Judge Assignment(sbt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent
1 1 25 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney) Wed 02/26 10:25 AM
COMPLAINT against LEVAN MACHINE CO., INC. D/B/A LEVAN MACHINE & TRUCK EQUIPMENT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-18099667.), filed by ERIC DEMUN.(STEENLAND, KYLE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Attorney Required Forms Wed 02/26 11:16 AM
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. PLAINTIFF's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. Form is missing. (sbt)
Related: [-]