Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:24-bk-32777

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Jeffrey P Norman
Case #: 4:25-ap-03060
Nature of Suit63 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(8), student loan
Case Filed:Feb 14, 2025
Terminated:May 06, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
U S Department of Education
Represented By
U S Department of Education
contact info
Defendant
EdFinancial Services
Represented By
EdFinancial Services
contact info
Plaintiff
George Saxon
4027 Southern Trace Dr
College Station, TX 77845
Represented By
George Saxon
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/08 11:41 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 05/08/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Order Dismissing Adversary Case
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
11 11 order Dismissing Adversary Case Tue 05/06 3:39 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Case 4:25-ap-3060 Signed on 5/6/2025 (srh4)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
10 10 court Summons Issued Tue 03/18 11:19 AM
Summons Issued on EdFinancial Services Date Issued 3/18/2025; U S Department of Education Date Issued 3/18/2025. (bwl4)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 03/14 11:33 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 03/14/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Scheduling Order
Thursday, March 13, 2025
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 03/13 11:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 03/13/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order on Motion to Reopen Adversary
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
7 7 order Scheduling Order Wed 03/12 10:46 AM
Preliminary Pretrial Order Signed on 3/12/2025 Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/14/2025 at 11:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 403 (JPN). (trc4)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
6 6 order Reopen Adversary Tue 03/11 3:18 PM
Order Granting Motion To Reopen Adversary 4:25-ap-3060 Related [+] Signed on 3/11/2025. Order of Dismissal at ECF3 is Vacated. (trc4)
Related: [-] 5
Monday, March 03, 2025
5 5 motion Reopen Adversary Thu 03/06 12:00 PM
Motion to Reopen Adversary. Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by George Saxon (dah4)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 02, 2025
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 03/02 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 03/02/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Order Dismissing Adversary Case
Friday, February 28, 2025
3 3 order Dismissing Adversary Case Fri 02/28 8:47 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Case 4:25-ap-3060 Signed on 2/28/2025. Case closed. (trc4)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
2 2 court Summons Issued Wed 02/26 10:46 AM
Summons Issued on EdFinancial Services Date Issued 2/26/2025; U S Department of Education Date Issued 2/26/2025; U.S. Attorney General and U.S. Attorney's Office Date Issued 2/26/2025. (th4)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint [system event] Wed 02/26 10:31 AM
Adversary case 25-03060 Nature of Suit: (63 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(8), student loan)) Complaint by George Saxon against U S Department of Education , EdFinancial Services . Receipt Number o, Fee Amount $350 (th4)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Cover Sheet
Att: 2 Cover Letter