Michael Elliott v. Werner Enterprises, Inc.
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Percy Anderson |
Referred: | Sheri Pym |
Case #: | 5:25-cv-00512 |
Nature of Suit | 790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Feb 26, 2025 |
Case in other court: | San Bernardino Superior Court, CIVSB2431220 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 12, 2025 3:44 AM PDT |
Defendant
Werner Enterprises, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DOES
|
|
Plaintiff
Michael Elliott
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 48 minutes ago |
Thursday, May 01, 2025 | ||
27 | 27
![]() MINUTES IN CHAMBERS-COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. For all of the foregoing reasons, the Court denies Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. (See document for further details).; denying12 MOTION to Remand Case to San Bernardino. (aco) |
|
Friday, April 25, 2025 | ||
26 | 26
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Fri 04/25 10:22 AM
IN CHAMBERS ORDER TAKING MOTION UNDER ADVISEMENT by Judge Percy Anderson. A hearing on the MOTION to Remand12 is scheduled for April 28, 2025, at 1:30 p.m. Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, the Court finds this matter appropriate for decision without oral argument. The hearing calendared for April 28, 2025, is vacated and the matter taken off calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kss) |
|
Wednesday, April 16, 2025 | ||
25 | 25
![]() CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER [FED. R. CIV. P. 16(b)] by Judge Percy Anderson. 1. Establishing a Discovery Cut-off Date of October 27, 2025; 2. Setting Motion Cut-off date of November 3, 2025; 3. Setting Final Pretrial Conference for December 5, 2025, at 1:30 p.m.; 4. Setting Jury Trial Date of January 6, 2026, at 9:00 a.m. (See document for further details). (aco) |
|
Tuesday, April 15, 2025 | ||
24 | 24
![]() MINUTES IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson. Dates set by the Court in this action are listed in the "Schedule of Trial and Pretrial Dates" attached to this order. The scheduling conference currently on calendar for April 21, 2024 at 10:30 a.m. is hereby vacated, and the matter taken off calendar. The Court has entered a Protective Order in this action. Pursuant to the agreement of the parties, this matter has been referred to private mediation. Final Pretrial Conference 12/05/25 at 1:30 p.m. Jury Trial 01/06/26 at 9:00 a.m. (See document for additional deadlines and details). (aco) |
|
23 | 23
![]() ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Percy Anderson. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than November 10, 2025. (aco) |
|
22 | 22
![]() PROTECTIVE ORDER CONCERNING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION by Judge Percy Anderson. The Court enters the following protective order: (See document for further details). (aco) |
|
Monday, April 14, 2025 | ||
21 | 21
![]() JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Plaintiff Michael Elliott.. (Mirzaie, Narak) |
|
Friday, April 11, 2025 | ||
20 | 20
![]() ORDER DENYING JOINT STIPULATION by Judge Percy Anderson. The Court finds as follows: 1. The Joint Stipulation is denied. The parties are ordered to file their Rule 26 Joint Report no later than noon, April 15, 2025. The Scheduling Conference remains on calendar for April 21, 2025. RE: First STIPULATION to Continue SCHEDULING CONFERENCE19 . (aco) |
|
Monday, April 07, 2025 | ||
19 | 19
![]() First STIPULATION to Continue SCHEDULING CONFERENCE from April 21, 2025 to 120 days filed by Defendant Werner Enterprises, Inc..(Maretz, Peter) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
18 | 18
![]() OPPOSITION to Second NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to San Bernardino12 filed by Defendant Werner Enterprises, Inc.. (Maretz, Peter) |
|
Monday, March 31, 2025 | ||
17 | 17
![]() JOINT REPORT REPORT of PARTIES MEET AND CONFER EFFORTS FOR PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND filed by Defendant Werner Enterprises, Inc.. (Maretz, Peter) |
|
Tuesday, March 25, 2025 | ||
16 | 16
![]() DECLARATION of Narak Mirzaie in support of Second NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to San Bernardino12 filed by Plaintiff Michael Elliott. (Mirzaie, Narak) |
|
15 | 15
![]() MINUTES IN CHAMBERS-COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. The Court orders counsel to meet and confer no later than March 28, 2025. By no later than March 31, 2025, the parties shall file a Joint Report attesting to their meet and confer efforts and setting forth specific points of disagreement raised during the Local Rule 7-3 conference. In the alternative, the parties may file a Notice of Withdrawal of Motion. If the Joint Report filed on March 31, 2025 indicates that the parties are unable to resolve the issues presented in the Motion to Remand during their meeting of counsel, defendant's Opposition shall be filed on April 7, 2025, and Plaintiff shall file his Reply, if any, on April 14, 2025. (See document for further details). (aco) |
|
Monday, March 24, 2025 | ||
14 | 14
![]() PROPOSED ORDER re Second NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to San Bernardino12 filed by Plaintiff Michael Elliott. (Mirzaie, Narak) |
|
13 | 13
![]() DECLARATION of Narak Mirzaie in support of Second NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to San Bernardino12 filed by Plaintiff Michael Elliott. (Mirzaie, Narak) |
|
12 | 12
![]() Second NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to San Bernardino filed by Plaintiff Michael Elliott. Motion set for hearing on 4/28/2025 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Mirzaie, Narak) |
|
Wednesday, March 05, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
![]() ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Werner Enterprises, Inc..(Maretz, Peter) |
|
Tuesday, March 04, 2025 | ||
10 | 10
![]() STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco) |
|
9 | 9
![]() SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)] by Judge Percy Anderson. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE set for April 21, 2025, at 10:30 a.m. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco) |
|
8 | 8
![]() ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE Pursuant to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges. (identical case) by Judge Mark C. Scarsi, Case Management and Assignment Committee Chair. Case transferred to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. All discovery matters are transferred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. Case number now reads as 5:25-cv-00512 PA(SPx). (rn) |
|
Friday, February 28, 2025 | ||
7 | 7
![]() PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Werner Enterprises, Inc., served on February 28, 2025. (Maretz, Peter) |
|
Thursday, February 27, 2025 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) |
|
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) |
|
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case and Notice re Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for discovery. Pursuant to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Anne Hwang. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:25-cv-00512 AH (SHKx). (jtil) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
![]() CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Werner Enterprises, Inc., identifying Gra-Gar, LLC, BlackRock, Inc. and The Vanguard Group. (Maretz, Peter) |
|
2 | 2
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Werner Enterprises, Inc.. (Maretz, Peter) |
|
1 | 1
![]() NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino, case number CIVSB2431220 Receipt No: ACACDC-39180333 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Werner Enterprises, Inc.. (Attorney Peter Maretz added to party Werner Enterprises, Inc.(pty:dft))(Maretz, Peter) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Thu 02/27 4:19 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Michael Elliott in San Bernardino Superior Court on 10/15/2025, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil) |