Florida Middle District Court
Judge:John L Badalamenti
Referred: Nicholas P Mizell
Case #: 2:25-cv-00155
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause42:4072 Payment of Flood Insurance Claim
Case Filed:Feb 26, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 12, 2025 7:29 AM EDT
Defendant
American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida
Represented By
Eugene P. Murphy
Robinson & Cole LLP
contact info
Nikolaos Manuel Hernandez
Robinson Cole
contact info
Plaintiff
Domenico D'Ambrosio
Represented By
Dwight L. Walker
Ave Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Michele D'Ambrosio
Represented By
Dwight L. Walker
Ave Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
22 22 notice Notice (Other) Tue 05/06 12:05 PM
NOTICE by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida re7 Case Management Scheduling Order, 21 Order Certificate of Familiarity Filed Jointly by the Parties (Hernandez, Nikolaos)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
21 21 order Order Mon 05/05 12:44 PM
TEXT ORDER directing compliance. The Hurricane Scheduling Order requires a joint certification that the parties are familiar with and will abide by the court's local rules and orders entered as of the certification date. The parties failed to file a certification by the required date. They must promptly file the certification, or , by May 19, 2025, they must show cause why they should not be sanctioned for neither participating in the filing of the joint notice nor seeking any relief from the certification requirement. The parties are reminded that the Scheduling Order conveniently includes a table summarizing all deadlines. (Doc. 7 at 19). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 5/5/2025. (TLP)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
20 20 motion Dismiss Fri 04/18 1:53 PM
MOTION to Dismiss complaint by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida.(Hernandez, Nikolaos)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 12 19-2022 - Letter from Assurant to Insured
Friday, April 04, 2025
19 19 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Fri 04/04 3:19 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Domenico D'Ambrosio. (Walker, Dwight)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
18 18 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 03/20 11:30 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 14 defendant's motion for extension of time to respond. By April 21, 2025, defendant must respond to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 3/20/2025. (TLP)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Order Thu 03/20 10:48 AM
TEXT ORDER: Local Rule 3.03 requires that, with the first appearance, each party must file a disclosure statement using the standard form from the clerk or the court's website. Plaintiffs failed to do so. By April 3, 2025, plaintiffs must file their disclosure statement using the standard form, which can be found at: https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/form/disclosure-statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 3/20/2025. (TLP)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of a Related Action Thu 03/20 10:07 AM
Amended NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida. Related case(s): No (Hernandez, Nikolaos) Modified on 3/20/2025 to edit docket text (MSN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
15 15 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 03/19 5:31 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re6 Civil Action Order by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida identifying Corporate Parent Assurant, Other Affiliate Interfinancial, Inc. for American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida. (Hernandez, Nikolaos)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Wed 03/19 5:25 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida.(Hernandez, Nikolaos)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Emails to PC Requesting Extension of Time
13 13 notice Notice of a Related Action Wed 03/19 5:18 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida. Related case(s): No (Hernandez, Nikolaos). Notified attorney both yes and no are checked off in the pleading and to re-file an amended one. Modified on 3/20/2025 to edit docket text (MSN)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Wed 03/19 5:17 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Nikolaos Manuel Hernandez on behalf of American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida. Lead Counsel: Eugene P. Murphy. (Hernandez, Nikolaos)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
11 11 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 03/05 1:26 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Dwight L. Walker of Local Rule 2.01(b)(2)(B), which requires members of the Middle District bar to maintain with the clerk a current telephone number, mailing address, and email address. Update your contact information for the Middle District through PACER. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
10 10 utility Case Referred to Mediation Wed 03/05 1:23 PM
CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (AM)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Tue 03/04 10:39 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Dwight L. Walker on behalf of Domenico D'Ambrosio. Lead Counsel: DWIGHT WALKER. (Walker, Dwight)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Protective Order Tue 03/04 9:51 AM
HURRICANE INTERIM PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 3/4/2025.(WRW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
7 7 order Case Management Scheduling Order Tue 03/04 9:48 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: (HURRICANE) Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 3/4/2025. (WRW)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Civil Action Order Tue 03/04 9:45 AM
CIVIL Action Order Signed by All Divisional Judges on 3/4/2025. (WRW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
5 5 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 02/27 3:56 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL All counsel of record of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MLB)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons issued Thu 02/27 3:55 PM
SUMMONS issued as to American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida. (MLB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
3 3 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 02/26 3:53 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:25-cv-155-JLB-NPM. (RPB)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Proposed summons Wed 02/26 3:17 PM
PROPOSED summons to be issued by Domenico D'Ambrosio and Michele D'Ambrosio. (Walker, Dwight) Modified on 2/27/2025 to edit the docket text (MLB)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 02/26 3:16 PM
COMPLAINT against American Bankers Insurance Company (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-23065985) filed by All Plaintiffs.(Walker, Dwight) Modified on 2/27/2025to edit the docket text (MLB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet