Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Kathryn Kimball Mizelle
Referred: Lindsay S Griffin
Case #: 8:25-cv-00473
Nature of Suit751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Feb 26, 2025
Case in other court:Polk County, 2024CA004273
Last checked: Saturday Apr 12, 2025 7:31 AM EDT
Defendant
Oakley Transport, Inc.
Represented By
Cheyenne T. Lewis, I
Zimmerman, Kiser & Sutcliffe, PA
contact info
J. Scott Hudson
Zimmerman, Kiser & Sutcliffe, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Gwendolyn Williams
Represented By
Marie A. Mattox
Marie A Mattox PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
17 17 order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Wed 04/23 10:16 AM
ENDORSED ORDER: Defendant Oakley Transport, Inc.'s 15 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. As set out in the 16 Case Management and Scheduling Order, the Court requires a party seeking summary judgment to "confer in good faith with the party or parties against whom summary judgment is sought for the purpose of narrowing the factual issues in dispute" and to file a Joint Statement of Undisputed Facts "agreed upon by all parties and with citations to the record" before moving for summary judgment. The parties are also advised that, while Oakley is free to refile its motion for partial summary judgment after filing a Joint Statement of Undisputed Facts, successive motions for summary judgment "will not be permitted." (Doc. 16 ) at 3. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 4/23/2025. (SJR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
16 16 order Case Management Scheduling Order Tue 04/22 6:38 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by December 19, 2025. Dispositive motions due by February 13, 2026. Pretrial Conference scheduled for July 9, 2026, at 1:30 PM in Tampa Courtroom 13B before Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle. Jury Trial scheduled for the August 2026 trial calendar in Tampa Courtroom 13B before Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle. Conduct mediation by January 30, 2026. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 4/22/2025. (GSO) (Main Document 16 replaced on 4/22/2025) (GSO)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
15 15 motion Summary Judgment Mon 04/21 2:39 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Oakley Transport, Inc.. (Hudson, J.)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
14 14 misc Case Management Report Mon 04/07 3:13 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Lewis, Cheyenne)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
13 13 answer Answer to amended complaint Mon 03/24 12:03 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 12 Amended Complaint by Oakley Transport, Inc..(Hudson, J.) Modified on 3/24/2025 to edit docket text (JDR)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 03/14 9:29 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Oakley Transport, Inc. with Jury Demand. filed by Gwendolyn Williams.(Mattox, Marie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
11 11 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 03/11 5:54 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re3 Order by Gwendolyn Williams. (Mattox, Marie)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Tue 03/11 5:41 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Marie A. Mattox on behalf of Gwendolyn Williams. Lead Counsel: Marie A. Mattox. (Mattox, Marie)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 03/11 9:53 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re3 Order by Oakley Transport, Inc. (Hudson, J.) Modified on 3/11/2025 to edit docket text (MSN)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of a Related Action Tue 03/11 9:50 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Oakley Transport, Inc. Related case(s): No (Hudson, J.) Modified on 3/11/2025 to edit docket text (MSN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
7 7 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 03/06 9:05 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Oakley Transport, Inc., must respond to the plaintiff's complaint no later than March 17, 2025. Should the plaintiff amend her complaint, the defendant will have 14 days to respond. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(3). Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 3/6/2025. (SJR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Wed 03/05 2:05 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Notice of Removal Defendant's Unopposed Motion for An Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Oakley Transport, Inc.. (Lewis, Cheyenne)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of appearance Wed 03/05 1:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Cheyenne T. Lewis, I on behalf of Oakley Transport, Inc. (Lewis, Cheyenne)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Wed 03/05 1:55 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by J. Scott Hudson on behalf of Oakley Transport, Inc.. Lead Counsel: J. Scott Hudson, Esquire. (Hudson, J.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
3 3 12 pgs order Order Thu 02/27 12:12 PM
CIVIL CASE STANDING ORDER. The parties shall meet and file a Case Management Report using the standard form on the Court's website within forty days after removal. Each party must also file a Corporate Disclosure Statement using the standard template attached to this Order (also available on the undersigned's website under the "forms" tab) within fourteen days after appearing. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 2/27/2025. (SJR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 02/26 4:14 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle and Magistrate Judge Lindsay S. Griffin. New case number: 8:25-cv-473-KKM-LSG. (RPB)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 02/26 4:09 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court Of The Tenth Judicial Circuit, case number 53-2024-CA-004273 filed in State Court on November 13, 2024. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-23066310 filed by Oakley Transport, Inc..(Hudson, J.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court COMPLAINT,
Att: 2 State Court Docket Sheet,
Att: 3 State Court Other Documents,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet