Nevada District Court
Judge:Richard F Boulware, II
Referred: Maximiliano D Couvillier
Case #: 2:25-cv-00366
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Feb 26, 2025
Terminated:Apr 22, 2025
Case in other court:Eighth Judicial District Court, A-25-910038-C
Last checked: Saturday Apr 12, 2025 4:13 AM PDT
Defendant
Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Represented By
James Ernest Harper
Harper Selim
contact info
Sabrina G. Wibicki
Harper Selim
contact info
Plaintiff
Devina Elaine Whitley
Represented By
Gerald Ivey Gillock
Gillock & Coggeshall
contact info
Ashley Watkins
Sam & Ash LLP
contact info
Daniel John McAdorey
Gerald I. Gillock & Associates
contact info
Michael Hunter Coggeshall
Gerald I. Gillock & Associates
contact info
Samuel Mirejovsky
Sam & Ash LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Order Dismissing Case Tue 04/22 3:34 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE granting11 Stipulation for Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/22/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
11 11 motion Stipulation Thu 04/17 4:35 PM
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Defendant Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Harper, James) (dismissal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
10 10 notice Notice Other Tue 03/25 2:45 PM
NOTICE Notice of FRCP 26(f) Conference by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Harper, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
9 9 misc Status Report Mon 03/24 3:39 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Harper, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
8 8 misc Certificate Interested Parties Fri 03/07 2:16 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Devina Elaine Whitley. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (McAdorey, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
7 7 misc Statement in Removal Case Tue 03/04 2:13 PM
STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Harper, James)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Jury Demand Tue 03/04 2:12 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Harper, James)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Certificate Interested Parties Tue 03/04 2:10 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Harper, James)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Petition for Removal Tue 03/04 2:10 PM
ANSWER re1 Petition for Removal,, filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/14/2025. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/18/2025.(Harper, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
3 3 order Standing Order Thu 02/27 8:12 AM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III. Judge Couvillier's Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink:[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
2 2 minord Minute Order Removal Case Wed 02/26 4:17 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/26/2025. By Deputy Clerk: A. Miller. Statement regarding removed action is due by 3/13/2025. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 3/28/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition Removal Wed 02/26 1:22 PM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court, Case Number A-25-910038-C, (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANVDC-7968655) by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/8/2025. (Harper, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Wed 02/26 4:16 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III. (AMMi)
Related: [-]