Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:S Maurice Hicks, Jr
Referred: Carol B Whitehurst
Case #: 6:25-cv-00243
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Feb 26, 2025
Case in other court:15th JDC Lafayette Parish, C-20246997
Last checked: Saturday Apr 12, 2025 4:51 AM CDT
Defendant
Lowes Home Centers L L C
Represented By
Lacey Sanchez Rispone
Taylor Wellons Et Al (br)
contact info
Cy Hebert
Taylor Wellons Et Al (br)
contact info
David Scott Rainwater
Taylor Wellons Et Al (br)
contact info
Plaintiff
Landry Thomas, Jr
Represented By
Dustin Blake Gibson
Domengeaux Wright Et Al (laf)
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, March 27, 2025
9 9 misc Response to Removal Order Thu 03/27 9:23 AM
RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Lowes Home Centers L L C . (aty,Hebert, Cy)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/24 9:29 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Lowes Home Centers L L C.(aty,Hebert, Cy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 02/27 1:24 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Lowes Companies Inc by Lowes Home Centers L L C. (aty,Hebert, Cy) Modified to add filer on 2/27/2025 (Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Thu 02/27 1:10 PM
DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lowes Home Centers L L C. (aty,Hebert, Cy)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Removal Order Thu 02/27 11:38 AM
REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 2/27/2025. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
4 4 motion Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF) Wed 02/26 3:25 PM
PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/26/2025. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included) Wed 02/26 3:21 PM
NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Notice of Removal, sent to Cy Hebert on behalf of Lowe's Home Centers LLC; and Dustin Blake Gibson on behalf of Landry Thomas, Jr. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 3/12/2025. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included) Wed 02/26 3:17 PM
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Notice of Removal, sent to Cy Hebert on behalf of Lowe's Home Centers LLC. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 3/12/2025. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 02/26 2:49 PM
NOTICE of Removal from 15th JDC Lafayette Parish, Case Number C-20246997 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-6201821) filed by Lowe's Home Centers LLC.(Attorney Cy Hebert added to party Lowe's Home Centers LLC(pty:dft))(aty,Hebert, Cy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F,
Att: 8 Exhibit G,
Att: 9 Exhibit H
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 02/26 3:15 PM
CASE Assigned to Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]