California Northern District Court
Judge:Jacqueline Scott Corley
Case #: 3:25-cv-02041
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Feb 26, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 12, 2025 4:20 AM PDT
Defendant
United Rentals (North America), Inc.
Represented By
Julie Marie Capell
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Arielle Jana Spinner
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Jaime Danielle Walter
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Mario Martin
Represented By
Norman B. Blumenthal
Blumenthal, Nordrehaug Bhowmik De Blouw LLP
contact info
Sergio Julian Puche
Blumenthal Nordrehaug Bhowmik De Blouw LLP
contact info
Nicholas J. De Blouw
Blumenthal Nordrehaug Bhowmik De Blouw LLP
contact info
Trevor Girard Moran
Blumenthal Nordrehaug Bhowmik De Blouw LLP
contact info
Jeffrey Scott Herman
Blumenthal Nordrehaug Bhowmik De Blouw LLP
contact info
Kyle R Nordrehaug
Blumenthal Nordrehaug And Bhowmik
contact info
Aparajit Bhowmik
Blumenthal Nordrehaug Bhowmik De Blouw LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 01, 2025
21 21 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Thu 05/01 12:00 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byMario Martin.(Herman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 19 Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Arbitration of Plaintiff's individual claims and to Dismiss his class claims
Att: 1 Declaration
Friday, April 18, 2025
20 20 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Fri 04/18 10:01 AM
REPLY Related [+] filed byMario Martin. (Moran, Trevor)
Related: [-] 17 NOtice of Motion and Motion to Remand Case to State Court
Thursday, April 17, 2025
19 19 motion Compel Thu 04/17 3:02 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by United Rentals (North America), Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/22/2025 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 08, 19th Floor before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 5/1/2025. Replies due by 5/8/2025.(Walter, Jaime)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Jaime D. Walter,
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Walter Declaration,
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Walter Declaration,
Att: 4 Declaration of Colleen Mcdade,
Att: 5 Exhibit C to Mcdade Declaration,
Att: 6 Proposed Order
Friday, April 11, 2025
18 18 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Fri 04/11 12:28 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byUnited Rentals (North America), Inc..(Walter, Jaime)
Related: [-] 17 NOtice of Motion and Motion to Remand Case to State Court
Att: 1 Declaration of Anthony Dobson
Friday, March 28, 2025
17 17 motion Remand Fri 03/28 1:17 PM
Notice of Motion and Motion to Remand Case to State Court filed by Mario Martin. Motion Hearing set for 5/22/2025 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 08, 19th Floor before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 4/11/2025. Replies due by 4/18/2025.(Moran, Trevor) Modified on 3/28/2025 (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Case To State Court,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Tue 03/25 5:38 PM
NOTICE by United Rentals (North America), Inc. of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding [L.R. 3-13] (Spinner, Arielle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
15 15 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Wed 03/12 1:24 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 5/28/2025. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 6/4/2025 at 2:00 p.m. before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsc] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at jsccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than noon on 6/3/2025. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (ahm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
14 14 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 03/11 1:46 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned using a proportionate, random and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case. Counsel are instructed that all future filings shall bear the updated judicial initials immediately after the case number. Counsel are reminded to verify the location of the judge on the court website. All hearing and trial dates presently scheduled are vacated. However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. Motions must be renoticed for hearing before the judge to whom the case has been reassigned, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. Other deadlines such as those for ADR compliance and discovery cutoff also remain unchanged. Mark B. Busby Clerk, United States District Court (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
13 13 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Tue 03/11 1:00 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (bxl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 03/11 10:55 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mario Martin.. (Herman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
11 11 service Certificate/Proof of Service Wed 03/05 3:10 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United Rentals (North America), Inc. re5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines,, (Walter, Jaime)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Certificate/Proof of Service Wed 03/05 3:09 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United Rentals (North America), Inc. re1 Notice of Removal, 4 Case Assigned by Intake,,2 Certificate of Interested Entities,3 Certificate of Interested Entities (Walter, Jaime)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Fri 02/28 3:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Trevor Girard Moran on behalf of Mario Martin (Moran, Trevor)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Fri 02/28 3:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Sergio Julian Puche on behalf of Mario Martin (Puche, Sergio)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Fri 02/28 3:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Jeffrey Scott Herman on behalf of Mario Martin (Herman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Fri 02/28 3:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Aparajit Bhowmik on behalf of Mario Martin (Bhowmik, Aparajit)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Thu 02/27 11:13 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See [LINK:General Order 71] . Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 5/26/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/2/2025 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 02/27 9:12 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/13/2025. (kxo, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Thu 02/27 10:47 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Arielle Jana Spinner and Jaime Danielle Walter - The docket shows a different address from what is appearing on the document. Please update your personal profile on ECF. Re: 1 Notice of Removal, filed by United Rentals (North America), Inc. (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
3 3 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 02/26 6:21 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Rentals (North America), Inc. identifying Corporate Parent United Rentals, Inc. for United Rentals (North America), Inc.. (Walter, Jaime)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 02/26 6:15 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by United Rentals (North America), Inc. identifying Corporate Parent United Rentals, Inc. for United Rentals (North America), Inc.. (Walter, Jaime)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 02/26 5:17 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco Superior. Their case number is CGC-24-620586. (Filing fee $405 receipt number CCANDC-20396139). Filed by United Rentals (North America), Inc..(Walter, Jaime)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Jaime D. Walter,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Declaration of Anthony Dobson,
Att: 7 Exhibit E,
Att: 8 Declaration of Cristina Madry,
Att: 9 Civil Cover Sheet
respoth Answer to Removal Complaint Thu 02/27 11:06 AM
Answer to Removal Complaint dcoket no.1 - Exhibit C by United Rentals (North America), Inc.. (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]