Arizona District Court
Case #: 2:25-mj-01308
Case Filed:Feb 24, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Feb 27, 2025 12:56 AM MST
Defendant
Talha Saif (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Sydney Yew
Us Attorneys Office - Phoenix, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/27/2025 2:26 AM MST
Sunday, February 23, 2025
Arrest of Talha Saif on 2/23/2025. (NM)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Talha Saif. (NM)
Related: [-]