Pennsylvania Western District Court
Case #: 1:25-cr-00006
Case Filed:Feb 25, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Feb 27, 2025 2:43 AM EST
Defendant
FELIPE DE JESUS CORTES-SOTO (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Paul S. Sellers
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/27/2025 4:07 AM EST
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
Judge update in case as to FELIPE DE JESUS CORTES-SOTO. Judge Susan Paradise Baxter added. (jkn)
Related: [-]
1 1 INDICTMENT as to FELIPE DE JESUS CORTES-SOTO (1) count 1. (jkn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification and Notice for Filing Pretrial Motions,
Att: 2 Arraignment Plea,
Att: 3 Criminal Case Info Sheet
2 2 Indictment MEMORANDUM as to FELIPE DE JESUS CORTES-SOTO (jkn)
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION for Arrest Warrant by USA as to FELIPE DE JESUS CORTES-SOTO. (jkn)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER granting3 Motion for Arrest Warrant as to FELIPE DE JESUS CORTES-SOTO (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kezia O.L. Taylor on 2/25/2025. (jkn)
Related: [-]