California Northern District Court
Judge:Haywood S Gilliam, Jr
Case #: 4:25-cv-01813
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Feb 20, 2025
Case in other court:Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, 24CV103662
Last checked: Sunday Apr 06, 2025 2:39 AM PDT
Defendant
1930 CVS Rx Services, Inc.
Defendant
CVS Rx Services, Inc.
Represented By
Daniel F. Fears
Payne & Fears LLP
contact info
Leilani Elizabeth Jones
Payne And Fears LLP
contact info
Andrew Keith Haeffele
Payne & Fears LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Maria Coelho
Represented By
Jay Toivo Jambeck
Leigh Law Group P.C.
contact info
Damien Berkes Troutman
Leigh Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Mandy G. Leigh
Leigh Law Group, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 14, 2025
12 12 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Mon 04/14 4:01 PM
REPLY Related [+] filed byCVS Rx Services, Inc.. (Jones, Leilani)
Related: [-] 8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Action; Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Monday, April 07, 2025
11 11 oth_sup Declaration in Opposition Mon 04/07 5:01 PM
DECLARATION of Mara M. Coelho in Opposition to8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Action; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byMaria Coelho. Related [+] (Jambeck, Jay)
Related: [-] 8
10 10 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Mon 04/07 4:56 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byMaria Coelho. (Jambeck, Jay)
Related: [-] 8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Action; Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Monday, March 24, 2025
9 9 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Mon 03/24 11:37 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE RE DOCKET NO.8 . The Judge's name is Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. In the future, the signature line of all proposed orders submitted should include Jr. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Compel Mon 03/24 11:29 AM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Action; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by CVS Rx Services, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/8/2025 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 4/7/2025. Replies due by 4/14/2025.(Jones, Leilani)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Leilani E. Jones in Support of Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Action,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F,
Att: 8 Exhibit G,
Att: 9 Exhibit H,
Att: 10 Exhibit I,
Att: 11 Exhibit J,
Att: 12 Declaration of Robert G. Bailey in Support of Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Action,
Att: 13 Exhibit 1,
Att: 14 Exhibit 2,
Att: 15 Exhibit 3,
Att: 16 Declaration of Gray Monteagudo in Support of Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Action,
Att: 17 Exhibit 1,
Att: 18 Exhibit 2,
Att: 19 Exhibit 3,
Att: 20 Declaration of Lorne Dunkerton in Support of Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Action,
Att: 21 Declaration of Melanie K. St. Angelo in Support of Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Action,
Att: 22 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Action
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
7 7 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Wed 02/26 1:04 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE.Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference via a Zoom webinar has been set for June 3, 2025, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. Case Management Statement due by May 27th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:25-cv-01813-HSG. All attorneys and pro se litigants appearing for the case management conference are required to join at least 15 minutes before the hearing to check-in with the CRD. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/hsg] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Wed 02/26 8:10 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (bns, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned using a proportionate, random and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros no longer assigned to the case. Counsel are instructed that all future filings shall bear the updated judicial initials immediately after the case number. Counsel are reminded to verify the location of the judge on the court website. All hearing and trial dates presently scheduled are vacated. However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. Motions must be renoticed for hearing before the judge to whom the case has been reassigned, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. Other deadlines such as those for ADR compliance and discovery cutoff also remain unchanged. Mark B. Busby Clerk, United States District Court (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (as, COURT STAFF) Modified on 2/26/2025 (as, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
5 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by CVS Rx Services, Inc... (Jones, Leilani)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
4 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See [LINK:General Order 71] . Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 5/15/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/22/2025 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/6/2025. (smc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by CVS Rx Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Rx Services, Inc., Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation, Corporate Parent CVS Pharmacy, Inc. for CVS Rx Services, Inc.. re1 Notice of Removal,,, (Jones, Leilani)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and Petition of Removal of Civil Action Under 28 U.S.C. §§ 1331 and 1441 from Superior Court of California, County of Alameda. Their case number is 24CV103662. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-20370415). Filed by CVS Rx Services, Inc..(Jones, Leilani)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Petition and Notice of Removal of civil Action Under 28 U.S.C. §§ 1332 and 1441,
Att: 2 Exhibit B Petition and Notice of Removal of civil Action Under 28 U.S.C. §§ 1332 and 1441,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Declaration of Leilani E. Jones in Support of Petition for Removal of Civil Action Under 28 U.S.C. §§ 1332 and 1441,
Att: 5 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Leilani E. Jones in Support of Petition for Removal of Civil Action Under 28 U.S.C. §§ 1332 and 1441,
Att: 6 Declaration of Tiffani Engstrom in Support of Petition for Removal of Civil Action Under 28 U.S.C. §§ 1332 and 1441
Answer to Removal Complaint by CVS Rx Services, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]