Florida Southern District Court
Judge:David S Leibowitz
Referred: Panayotta D Augustin-Bir
Case #: 0:25-cv-60389
Nature of Suit310 Torts - Personal Injury - Airplane
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Feb 27, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 13, 2025 6:55 AM EDT
Defendant
Southwest Airlines Co.
Wicker Smith 515 East Las Olas Blvd Suite 1400
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301
Represented By
Brandon Michael Polsky
Wicker Smith O'Hara Mccoy Ford, P.A.
contact info
Christopher John Jahr
Wicker Smith O'Hara Mccoy & Ford, P.A.
contact info
Mediator
Michael C Siboni
Siboni Law Group 3035 SE Maricamp Road Unit 104-301
Ocala, FL 34471
Plaintiff
Ada Vega Rojas
Jimenez Mazzitelli Mordes 9350 S Dixie Hwy PH 5
Miami, FL 33156
Represented By
Alexa Anne Delgado
contact info
Phillip Edward Holden
Jimenez Mazzitelli Mordes
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Thursday, April 17, 2025
11 11 2 pgs order Order Reassigning/Transferring Case Thu 04/17 10:28 AM
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge David S. Leibowitz and Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 4/17/2025. Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 4/16/2025. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
10 10 adr Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing Thu 03/27 1:12 PM
Joint NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Selected/Added Michael C Siboni, Southwest Airlines Co. as Mediator. (Polsky, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
9 9 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Mon 03/24 11:32 AM
GENERAL ORDER ON DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 3/24/2025. See attached document for full details. (mhr)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
8 8 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Mediation Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 03/14 7:03 AM
ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE & DISCOVERY DEADLINES, REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION & REFERRING DISCOVERY MOTIONS TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE : ( Jury Trial set for 10/26/2026 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas., Calendar Call set for 10/23/2026 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 3/13/2025. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
7 7 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Thu 03/13 10:15 AM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Southwest Airlines Co.(Polsky, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Schedule Jointly Proposed by the Parties
Thursday, March 06, 2025
6 6 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 03/06 11:36 AM
Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southwest Airlines Co. (Polsky, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
5 5 3 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Fri 02/28 7:41 AM
ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 2/27/2025. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 02/27 2:05 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brandon Michael Polsky on behalf of Southwest Airlines Co. (Polsky, Brandon)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 02/27 1:54 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher John Jahr on behalf of Southwest Airlines Co. (Jahr, Christopher)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Thu 02/27 12:19 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (scn)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) Thu 02/27 10:13 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint for Damages and Demand for Jury Trial) (Answer filed/No Motion to Dismiss filed) Filing fee $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18239597, filed by Southwest Airlines Co. (Polsky, Brandon) Modified text on 2/27/2025 (scn)
Related: [-]