South Carolina District Court
Judge:Sherri A Lydon
Referred: Paige J Gossett
Case #: 1:25-cv-01182
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Feb 27, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 13, 2025 8:03 AM EDT
Defendant
Aiken S.C, City of
Plaintiff
Roosevelt Mealing, Jr
P O Box 1282
Langley, SC 29834


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, April 10, 2025
13 13 misc Document Mailed Thu 04/10 10:01 AM
***DOCUMENT MAILED1 Complaint,12 Summons Issued,11 Order Service - Non-Inmate,6 Supplement placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Roosevelt Mealing, Jr P O Box 1282 Langley, SC 29834. (apsn)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Issued Thu 04/10 9:55 AM
Summons Issued as to Aiken S.C, City of. Service due by 7/9/2025. (apsn)
Related: [-]
11 11 4 pgs order Order - Service - Non-Inmate Thu 04/10 9:53 AM
ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk and directing plaintiff to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 4/10/2025. (apsn)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
7 7 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Mon 03/24 9:31 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Roosevelt Mealing, Jr.(apsn)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Supplement - Not an attachment to main document Mon 03/24 9:30 AM
SUPPLEMENT by Roosevelt Mealing, Jr to1 Complaint. (apsn)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
5 5 misc Document Mailed Fri 03/07 7:29 AM
***DOCUMENT MAILED4 Proper Form Order, summons form, Local Civil Rule 26.01 (D.S.C.) Interrogatories placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Roosevelt Mealing, Jr P O Box 1282 Langley, SC 29834. (apsn)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Proper Form Order Fri 03/07 7:28 AM
PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 3/28/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 03/06/2025. (apsn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 02/27 10:16 AM
COMPLAINT against Aiken S.C, City of ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number 300114804.), filed by Roosevelt Mealing, Jr.(apsn)
Related: [-]