California Northern District Court
Judge:Donna M Ryu
Case #: 4:25-cv-02060
Nature of Suit443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations
Cause42:1981 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Feb 27, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 13, 2025 3:53 AM PDT
Defendant
Abdulrahim Harara
Defendant
Jerusalem Boxing Club, LLC
Plaintiff
Michael Radice
Represented By
James Pasch
contact info
Michael Dominic Meuti
Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff
contact info
Brendan P Hogan
contact info
James Elliott Thompson
Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff
contact info
David Hopkins
Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff LLP
contact info
Corena Gamble Larimer
Adl
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 15, 2025
29 29 order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 05/15 5:08 PM
ORDER (AS MODIFIED) GRANTING 27 STIPULATED REQUEST FOREXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO 6/19/2025 AND CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Initial Case Management Conference is continued to 8/20/2025 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. Parties shall file a joint Case Management Conference Statement by 8/13/2025. All counsel and parties may access the webinar information (public hearings) at https://cand.uscourts.gov/judges/ryu-donna-m-dmr/ . Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/15/2025. (ig, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
28 28 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Wed 05/14 2:40 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 5/28/2025. (ig, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 05/14 10:58 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Jerusalem Boxing Club, LLC, Abdulrahim Harara, Native Grounds, Inc..(Katon, Glenn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Katon
26 26 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Wed 05/14 10:33 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Glenn Michael Katon on behalf of Jerusalem Boxing Club, LLC, Abdulrahim Harara, Native Grounds, Inc. (Katon, Glenn)
Related: [-]
25 25 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Wed 05/14 10:26 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE: Notice is hereby given to all parties that the Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/4/2025 is CONTINUED to 7/2/2025 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Parties shall file a joint case management statement by 6/25/2025. All counsel and parties may access the webinar information (public hearings) at https://cand.uscourts.gov/judges/ryu-donna-m-dmr/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
24 24 notice Notice (Other) Tue 05/13 1:10 PM
NOTICE by Michael Radice re3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, Notice Regarding Status of Case (Meuti, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
23 23 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 05/02 1:53 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Radice. Jerusalem Boxing Club, LLC served on 4/29/2025, answer due 5/20/2025. (Thompson, James)
Related: [-]
22 22 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 05/02 1:50 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Radice. Abdulrahim Harara served on 5/1/2025, answer due 5/22/2025. (Thompson, James)
Related: [-]
21 21 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 05/02 1:47 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Radice. Native Grounds, Inc. served on 5/1/2025, answer due 5/22/2025. (Thompson, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
20 20 service Summons Issued Tue 04/22 4:21 PM
Summons Issued as to Abdulrahim Harara, Jerusalem Boxing Club, LLC, Native Grounds, Inc. (slh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
19 19 misc Proposed Summons Wed 04/16 2:07 PM
Proposed Summons. (Thompson, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
18 18 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 04/15 12:19 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Abdulrahim Harara, Jerusalem Boxing Club, LLC, Native Grounds, Inc.. Filed by Michael Radice. (Meuti, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
17 17 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/03 4:38 PM
ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 16 James Maxwell Pasch's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
16 16 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/02 3:39 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of James Pasch ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20478608.) Filing fee previously paid on 03/20/2025 filed by Michael Radice. (Pasch, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
15 15 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/01 4:37 PM
ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 14 Brendan Patrick Hogan's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Tue 04/01 4:51 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] re:13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of James Pasch filed by Michael Radice. Attorney James Pasch's address on ECF (Beachwood, OH) does not match the address on his pro hac application10 (New York, NY). This application will not be processed until Mr. James Pasch updates/matches his address or re-files and updated form. (slh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
14 14 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/31 4:20 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Brendan Hogan ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20478636.) Filing fee previously paid on 03/20/2025 filed by Michael Radice. (Hogan, Brendan)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/31 4:13 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of James Pasch ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20478608.) Filing fee previously paid on 03/20/2025 filed by Michael Radice. (Pasch, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
utility Electronic Filing Error Mon 03/24 11:36 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] re:10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of James Pasch filed by Michael Radice. Attorney James Pasch's address on ECF and Attorney admissions does not match the address on his pro hac application10 . This application will not be processed until Mr. James Pasch updates/matches his address. (slh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Mon 03/24 11:38 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] re:11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Brendan Hogan filed by Michael Radice. Attorney Brendan Hogan's address on ECF and Attorney admissions does not match the address on his pro hac application11 . This application will not be processed until Mr. Brendan Hogan updates/matches his address. (slh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
12 12 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/21 10:50 AM
ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 9 David M. Hopkins's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
11 11 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/20 4:02 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Brendan Hogan ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20478636.) filed by Michael Radice. (Hogan, Brendan)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/20 3:59 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of James Pasch ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20478608.) filed by Michael Radice. (Pasch, James)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/20 3:52 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of David Hopkins ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20453495.) Filing fee previously paid on 03/13/2025 filed by Michael Radice. (Hopkins, David)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Thu 03/20 3:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by James Elliott Thompson on behalf of Michael Radice (Thompson, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Mon 03/17 3:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Corena Gamble Larimer on behalf of Michael Radice (Larimer, Corena)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
utility Electronic Filing Error Fri 03/14 2:15 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Re:6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of David Hopkins (Filing fee $328, receipt number ACANDC-20453495.) filed by Michael Radice. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office, pursuant to L.R. 11-3 the designated local co-counsel should maintain an office within the State of California. Please re-file a corrected application with a local address of co-counsel. (tn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
6 6 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/13 5:19 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of David Hopkins ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20453495.) filed by Michael Radice. (Hopkins, David) Modified on 3/14/2025 (tn, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 03/13 5:09 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Michael Radice.. (Meuti, Michael)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 03/13 5:05 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Michael Radice (Meuti, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
3 3 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Tue 03/04 5:10 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/28/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/4/2025 at 01:30 PM in Oakland, via Videoconference Only. (slh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
2 2 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 02/27 9:29 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/13/2025. (kam2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 02/27 6:30 AM
COMPLAINT against Abdulrahim Harara, Jerusalem Boxing Club, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20396936.). Filed by Michael Radice.(Meuti, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet