Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 0:24-bk-14430

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Scott M Grossman
Case #: 0:25-ap-01048
Nature of Suit51 Bankruptcy - Revocation of confirmation
Case Filed:Feb 26, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Acute Inc.
DCOTA, 1855 Griffin Road, Suite A-350
Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33004
Represented By
Brian S Behar, Esq
contact info
Defendant
Genetic Networks LLC
Behar, Gutt & Glazer. P.A. DCOTA Bldg. Suite A-350 1855 Griffin Rd.
Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33004
Represented By
Brian S Behar, Esq
contact info
Defendant
Dr. Raju's Pharma Solutions, LLC
Brian S. Behar, Esq. DCOTA Bldg- Suite A-350 1855 Griffin Rd.
Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33004
Represented By
Brian S Behar, Esq
contact info
Plaintiff
ECI Pharmaceuticals LLC
5311 NW 35th Ter
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309
Represented By
ECI Pharmaceuticals LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
BIORAMO LLC
5319 NW 35th Ter
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309
Represented By
BIORAMO LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
ECI Liquidating Trust
2255 Glades Road, Suite 324A
Boca Raton, FL 33431
Represented By
ECI Liquidating Trust
contact info
Plaintiff
Katie Goodman
2255 Glades Rd. Suite 324A
Boca Raton, FL 33431
Represented By
Katie Goodman
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
15 15 court Transcript Tue 04/22 7:54 AM
Transcript of 4/3/2025 Hearing. [ Transcript will be restricted for a period of 90 days. ] Related [+]. Redaction Request Due By 04/29/2025. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 05/13/2025. Redacted Transcript Due by 05/23/2025. Transcript access will be restricted through 07/21/2025. (Ouellette and Mauldin)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 25-01048 Complaint by Acute Inc., Genetic Networks LLC, Dr. Raju's Pharma Solutions, LLC against ECI Pharmaceuticals LLC, BIORAMO LLC, ECI Liquidating Trust; [Fee Amount $350] Nature of Suit:,(51 (Revocation of confirmation)) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit Exhibits B-E # 3 Exhibit Exhibit F -Part 1 # 4 Exhibit Exhibit F- Part 2 # 5 Exhibit Exhibit G # 6 Exhibit Exhibit H- Part 1 # 7 Exhibit Exhibit H- Part 2 # 8 Exhibit Exhibits I-L) (Behar, Brian) **Modified on 2/28/2025 to Reflect this is a Complaint and NOT a Notice of Removal and to Reflect Correct Role Type of Filers**.,7 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Re:1 Notice of Removal filed by Plaintiff Dr. Raju's Pharma Solutions, LLC, Plaintiff Acute Inc., Plaintiff Genetic Networks LLC , in addition to Motion For Sanctions Pursuant to 28 USC Sec 1927 Excessive Costs Against Acute Inc, Genetic Networks LLC, Dr. Raju's Pharma Solutions, LLC, Plaintiffs and Brian S. Behar, Esq. and Behar, Gutt & Glazer, P.A. Plaintiff's Counsel Filed by Defendants BIORAMO LLC, ECI Liquidating Trust, ECI Pharmaceuticals LLC, Katie Goodman (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Appellant Acute, Inc's Response in Opposition to Appellee's Motion to Dismiss Pending Appeal # 2 Exhibit B - Asset Purchase Agreement # 3 Exhibit C - Composite 1 # 4 Exhibit C - Composite 2 # 5 Exhibit C - Composite 3)
Friday, March 28, 2025
14 14 answer Reply Fri 03/28 10:51 AM
Reply to (7 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Re:1 Notice of Removal filed by Plaintiff Dr. Raju's Pharma Solutions, LLC, Plaintiff Acute Inc., Plaintiff Genetic Networks LLC filed by Defendant ECI Pharmaceuticals LLC, Defendant BIORAMO LLC, Defendant ECI Liquidating Trust, Defendant Katie Goodman, Motion For Sanctions Pursuant to 28 USC Sec 1927 Excessive Costs Against Acute Inc, Genetic Networks LLC, Dr. Raju's Pharma Solutions, LLC, Plaintiffs and Brian S. Behar, Esq. and Behar, Gutt & Glazer, P.A. Plaintiff's Counsel ,12 Response filed by Plaintiff Dr. Raju's Pharma Solutions, LLC, Plaintiff Acute Inc., Plaintiff Genetic Networks LLC) Filed by Defendants BIORAMO LLC, ECI Liquidating Trust, ECI Pharmaceuticals LLC, Katie Goodman (Wernick, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 23, 2025
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 03/24 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 03/23/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order Rescheduling Status Conference and Related Deadlines (Re: 1 Notice of Removal filed by Plaintiff Dr. Raju's Pharma Solutions, LLC, Plaintiff Acute Inc., Plaintiff Genetic Networks LLC). Status hearing to be held on 04/03/2025 at 10:00 AM U.S. Courthouse, 299 E Broward Blvd Courtroom 308 (SMG), Fort Lauderdale, FL. (Rodriguez, Lorenzo) Modified on 3/21/2025 to Correct Date and Time of Hearing. .
Friday, March 21, 2025
12 12 answer Response Fri 03/21 5:01 PM
Response to (7 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Re:1 Notice of Removal filed by Plaintiff Dr. Raju's Pharma Solutions, LLC, Plaintiff Acute Inc., Plaintiff Genetic Networks LLC filed by Defendant ECI Pharmaceuticals LLC, Defendant BIORAMO LLC, Defendant ECI Liquidating Trust, Defendant Katie Goodman, Motion For Sanctions Pursuant to 28 USC Sec 1927 Excessive Costs Against Acute Inc, Genetic Networks LLC, Dr. Raju's Pharma Solutions, LLC, Plaintiffs and Brian S. Behar, Esq. and Behar, Gutt & Glazer, P.A. Plaintiff's Counsel ) Filed by Plaintiffs Acute Inc., Dr. Raju's Pharma Solutions, LLC, Genetic Networks LLC (Behar, Brian)
Related: [-]
11 11 utility Corrective Entry Fri 03/21 11:20 AM
Notice of Corrective Entry to Correct Date and Time of Hearing Related [+] (Gomez, Edy)
Related: [-] 10 Order Rescheduling Status Conference and Related Deadlines (Re: 1 Notice of Removal filed by Plaintiff Dr. Raju's Pharma Solutions, LLC, Plaintiff Acute Inc., Plaintiff Genetic Networks LLC). Status hearing to be held on 04/03/2025 at 10:00 AM U.S. Courthouse, 299 E Broward Blvd Courtroom 308 (SMG), Fort Lauderdale, FL. (Rodriguez, Lorenzo) Modified on 3/21/2025 to Correct Date and Time of Hearing. .
10 10 2 pgs order Order Continuing Status/Scheduling Conference Fri 03/21 8:59 AM
Order Rescheduling Status Conference and Related Deadlines Related [+]. Status hearing to be held on 04/03/2025 at 10:00 AM U.S. Courthouse, 299 E Broward Blvd Courtroom 308 (SMG), Fort Lauderdale, FL. (Rodriguez, Lorenzo) Modified on 3/21/2025 to Correct Date and Time of Hearing. (Gomez, Edy)
Related: [-] 1 Notice of Removal filed by Plaintiff Dr. Raju's Pharma Solutions, LLC, Plaintiff Acute Inc., Plaintiff Genetic Networks LLC
Sunday, March 09, 2025
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 03/10 1:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 03/09/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order Setting Briefing Schedule and Hearing on Motion to Dismiss (Re: 7 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant ECI Pharmaceuticals LLC, Defendant BIORAMO LLC, Defendant ECI Liquidating Trust, Defendant Katie Goodman). Hearing scheduled for 04/03/2025 at 10:00 AM U.S. Courthouse, 299 E Broward Blvd Courtroom 308 (SMG), Fort Lauderdale, FL. (Cifuentes Esteban, Zoila)
Friday, March 07, 2025
8 8 2 pgs order Order Setting Hearing Fri 03/07 2:38 PM
Order Setting Briefing Schedule and Hearing on Motion to Dismiss Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 04/03/2025 at 10:00 AM U.S. Courthouse, 299 E Broward Blvd Courtroom 308 (SMG), Fort Lauderdale, FL. (Cifuentes Esteban, Zoila)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant ECI Pharmaceuticals LLC, Defendant BIORAMO LLC, Defendant ECI Liquidating Trust, Defendant Katie Goodman
Thursday, March 06, 2025
7 7 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Thu 03/06 2:20 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Re:1 Notice of Removal filed by Plaintiff Dr. Raju's Pharma Solutions, LLC, Plaintiff Acute Inc., Plaintiff Genetic Networks LLC , in addition to Motion For Sanctions Pursuant to 28 USC Sec 1927 Excessive Costs Against Acute Inc, Genetic Networks LLC, Dr. Raju's Pharma Solutions, LLC, Plaintiffs and Brian S. Behar, Esq. and Behar, Gutt & Glazer, P.A. Plaintiff's Counsel Filed by Defendants BIORAMO LLC, ECI Liquidating Trust, ECI Pharmaceuticals LLC, Katie Goodman (Wernick, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Appellant Acute, Inc's Response in Opposition to Appellee's Motion to Dismiss Pending Appeal
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Asset Purchase Agreement
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Composite 1
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Composite 2
Att: 5 Exhibit C - Composite 3
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Wed 03/05 2:25 PM
Certificate of Service of the Issued Summons [DE #3], Adversary Complaint [DE#1] and Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines [DE#5] Filed by Plaintiffs Acute Inc., Dr. Raju's Pharma Solutions, LLC, Genetic Networks LLC Related [+]. (Behar, Brian)
Related: [-] 1 Notice of Removal filed by Plaintiff Dr. Raju's Pharma Solutions, LLC, Plaintiff Acute Inc., Plaintiff Genetic Networks LLC,3 Summons in an Adversary Proceeding,5 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines
Monday, March 03, 2025
5 5 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Mon 03/03 10:23 AM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. Scheduling Conference to be held on 04/01/2025 at 09:30 AM U.S. Courthouse, 299 E Broward Blvd Courtroom 308 (SMG), Fort Lauderdale, FL. (Graster-Thomas, Tanesha)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Dr. Raju's Pharma Solutions, LLC, Plaintiff Acute Inc., Plaintiff Genetic Networks LLC
Sunday, March 02, 2025
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 03/03 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 03/02/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Summons in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on BIORAMO LLC Answer Due 3/31/2025; ECI Liquidating Trust Answer Due 3/31/2025; ECI Pharmaceuticals LLC Answer Due 3/31/2025; Katie Goodman Answer Due 3/31/2025
Friday, February 28, 2025
3 3 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Fri 02/28 4:51 PM
Summons in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on BIORAMO LLC Answer Due 3/31/2025; ECI Liquidating Trust Answer Due 3/31/2025; ECI Pharmaceuticals LLC Answer Due 3/31/2025; Katie Goodman Answer Due 3/31/2025 (Graster-Thomas, Tanesha)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Corrective Entry Fri 02/28 4:30 PM
Notice of Corrective Entry: This Case has Been Modified to Reflect this is an ADVERSARY COMPLAINT and NOT a Notice of Removal. In Addition, the Filers' Role Types Were Modified to Reflect the Information as Stated on the Uploaded PDF Image. Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 25-01048 Complaint by Acute Inc., Genetic Networks LLC, Dr. Raju's Pharma Solutions, LLC against ECI Pharmaceuticals LLC, BIORAMO LLC, ECI Liquidating Trust; [Fee Amount $350] Nature of Suit:,(51 (Revocation of confirmation) (Cohen, Diana
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 02/26 1:50 PM
Adversary case 25-01048 Notice of Removal Adversary Complaint by Defendant Acute Inc., Genetic Networks LLC, Dr. Raju's Pharma Solutions, LLC [Fee Amount $350] Nature of Suit:,(51 (Revocation of confirmation)) (Behar, Brian) Modified on 2/27/2025 to Edit Docket Text (Wilson, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibits B-E
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit F -Part 1
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit F- Part 2
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit G
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit H- Part 1
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit H- Part 2
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibits I-L