Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:24-bk-11488

Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Janet E Bostwick
Case #: 1:25-ap-01012
Nature of Suit63 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(8), student loan
Case Filed:Feb 26, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Wells Fargo
11000 White Rock Road
Rancho Cordova, CA 95670
Represented By
Wells Fargo
contact info
Defendant
Firstmark Services, Servicer
P.O. Box 82522
Lincoln, NE 68501
Represented By
Firstmark Services
contact info
Plaintiff
Shirley Ann Ramsdell
68 Spring St Unit 403
Mansfield, MA 02048
Represented By
Lauren Wilder Vandemortel
South Coastal Counties Legal Services
contact info
Ericka Lezcano
South Coastal Counties Legal Services
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Friday, April 04, 2025
7 7 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Fri 04/04 3:51 PM
Order dated 4/4/2025 Re:6 Assented to Motion filed by Defendant Firstmark Services to Extend Time to Respond1 Complaint. THE MOTION IS GRANTED AS FOLLOWS. THE DEADLINE FOR THE DEFENDANT NELNET SERVICING, LLC D/B/A FIRSTMARK SERVICES TO FILE AN ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED TO JUNE 26, 2025. FINDING GOOD CAUSE FOR DELAY, THE COURT WILL NOT ISSUE A SCHEDULING ORDER IN THIS MATTER UNTIL AFTER THAT EXTENDED DEADLINE. (skeating, usbc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
6 6 motion Extend Time Thu 03/27 1:36 PM
Assented to Motion filed by Defendant Firstmark Services to Extend Time to Respond [Re:1 Complaint]. (Shanahan, Emily)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
5 5 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Tue 03/18 9:30 AM
Order dated 3/18/2025 Re:4 Assisted to Motion filed by Defendant Wells Fargo to Extend Time to Answer1 Complaint. THE MOTION IS GRANTED AS FOLLOWS. THE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO TO FILE AN ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED TO JUNE 26, 2025. FINDING GOOD CAUSE FOR DELAY, THE COURT WILL NOT ISSUE A SCHEDULING ORDER IN THIS MATTER UNTIL AFTER THAT EXTENDED DEADLINE. (skeating, usbc)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
4 4 motion Extend Time Fri 03/14 3:24 PM
Assisted to Motion filed by Defendant Wells Fargo to Extend Time to Answer [Re:1 Complaint] with certificate of service. Related [+]
Related: [-] dd, Hanna
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
3 3 court Summons Issued Wed 02/26 2:02 PM
Summons Issued on Firstmark Services Answer Due 3/28/2025. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (skeating, usbc)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Wed 02/26 2:01 PM
Summons Issued on Wells Fargo Answer Due 3/28/2025. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (skeating, usbc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 02/26 1:42 PM
Adversary case 25-01012 Complaint by Shirley Ann Ramsdell against Wells Fargo, Firstmark Services. Fee Amount $0.00 Receipt Number EXEMPT. Nature of Suit(63 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(8), student loan))(Vandemortel, Lauren)
Related: [-]