Maryland District Court
Judge:Lydia Kay Griggsby
Case #: 1:25-cv-00666
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1446 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Feb 27, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 13, 2025 6:48 AM EDT
Defendant
Progressive Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By
Julia C. Barrett
King & Spalding
contact info
Allison Hill White
King & Spalding
contact info
Jeffrey S Cashdan
King And Spalding LLP
contact info
James Matthew Brigman
King & Spalding
contact info
Mark Bailen
Law Offices Of Mark I Bailen PC
contact info
Seth I. Euster
King & Spalding
contact info
Zachary A McEntyre
King And Spalding LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
James Williams, III
Represented By
Cary L. Joshi
Bailey & Glasser LLP
contact info
Edwin Lee Lowther, III
Carney Bates & Pulliam, PLLC
contact info
James L Kauffman
Bailey & Glasser
contact info
Edwin Eliu Elliott
Shamis & Gentile, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
36 36 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Mon 04/28 3:28 PM
ORDER granting35 Defendant's Consent Motion to Stay; directing the parties to file a joint status report within 14 days of the ruling or other disposition in the Freeman Appeal. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 4/28/2025. (bg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
35 35 motion Stay Tue 04/01 2:54 PM
Consent MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Progressive Specialty Insurance Company(Bailen, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, March 31, 2025
34 34 notice Notice (Other) Mon 03/31 3:51 PM
NOTICE by Progressive Specialty Insurance Company Pursuant to Local Rule 103.5(a)(Bailen, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Waiver of Service (2-27-25),
Att: 2 Notice of Removed Action (Deficient) (2-27-25),
Att: 3 Notice of Removal (2-27-25),
Att: 4 Notice of Removed Action (3-2-25),
Att: 5 MDEC Deficiency Notice (3-3-25),
Att: 6 MDEC Deficiency Notice - Writ (3-3-25)
Friday, March 28, 2025
33 33 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/28 11:57 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of James Matthew Brigman. Directing attorney James Matthew Brigman to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 3/28/2025. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
32 32 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/28 11:50 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Zachary A McEntyre. Directing attorney Zachary A McEntyre to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 3/28/2025. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
31 31 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/28 11:47 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Seth I. Euster. Directing attorney Seth I. Euster to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 3/28/2025. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
30 30 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/28 11:44 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Julia C. Barrett. Directing attorney Julia C. Barrett to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 3/28/2025. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
29 29 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/28 11:39 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Allison Hill White. Directing attorney Allison Hill White to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 3/28/2025. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
28 28 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/28 11:26 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jeffrey S Cashdan. Directing attorney Jeffrey S Cashdan to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 3/28/2025. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
27 27 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/26 12:48 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for James Matthew Brigman (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11867699.) by Progressive Specialty Insurance Company(Bailen, Mark)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/26 12:45 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Zachary A. McEntyre (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11867681.) by Progressive Specialty Insurance Company(Bailen, Mark)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/26 12:43 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Seth I. Euster (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11867642.) by Progressive Specialty Insurance Company(Bailen, Mark)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/26 12:32 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Julia Barrett Bates (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11867492.) by Progressive Specialty Insurance Company(Bailen, Mark)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/26 12:22 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Allison Hill White (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11867441.) by Progressive Specialty Insurance Company(Bailen, Mark)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/26 12:19 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jeffrey S. Cashdan (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11867368.) by Progressive Specialty Insurance Company(Bailen, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
21 21 order Order on Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/17 4:10 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting20 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of James L Kauffman. Directing attorney James L Kauffman to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 3/17/2025. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Pro Hac Vice - Corrected Mon 03/17 1:41 PM
CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for James L. Kauffman by James Williams, III. The fee has already been paid.(Joshi, Cary)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Order on Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/17 11:30 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting14 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Edwin Eliu Elliott. Directing attorney Edwin Eliu Elliott to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 3/17/2025. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice QC Notice - Pro Hac - Missing/Incomplete Info Mon 03/17 11:24 AM
QC NOTICE:16 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by James Williams, III needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding missing or incomplete information. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Thu 03/13 1:52 PM
NOTICE by Progressive Specialty Insurance Company re4 Amended Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions (Bailen, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
16 16 motion Pro Hac Vice - Corrected Wed 03/12 2:29 PM
CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for James L. Kauffman by James Williams, III. The fee has already been paid.(Joshi, Cary)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Order on Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/12 12:10 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting13 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Edwin Lee Lowther, III. Directing attorney Edwin Lee Lowther, III to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 3/12/2025. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Pro Hac Vice - Corrected Wed 03/12 8:54 AM
CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Edwin E. Elliott by James Williams, III. The fee has already been paid.(Joshi, Cary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
13 13 motion Pro Hac Vice - Corrected Tue 03/11 3:10 PM
CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Edwin Lee Lowther III by James Williams, III. The fee has already been paid.(Joshi, Cary)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
12 12 notice QC Notice - Pro Hac - Missing/Incomplete Info Mon 03/10 11:53 AM
QC NOTICE:9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by James Williams, III needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding missing or incomplete information. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice QC Notice - Pro Hac - Missing/Incomplete Info Mon 03/10 11:51 AM
QC NOTICE:8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by James Williams, III needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding missing or incomplete information. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice QC Notice - Pro Hac - Missing/Incomplete Info Mon 03/10 11:25 AM
QC NOTICE:5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by James Williams, III needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding missing or incomplete information. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
9 9 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/07 2:02 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Edwin E. Elliott (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11828183.) by James Williams, III(Joshi, Cary)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/07 1:53 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Edwin Lee Lowther III (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11828138.) by James Williams, III(Joshi, Cary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
7 7 order Case Management Order Thu 03/06 5:49 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby on 3/6/2025. (mu1s, Chambers)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 03/06 5:44 PM
ANSWER to3 Complaint by Progressive Specialty Insurance Company.(Bailen, Mark)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/06 1:50 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for James L. Kauffman (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11824961.) by James Williams, III(Joshi, Cary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
4 4 notice Amended Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions Tue 03/04 3:57 PM
Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
3 3 19 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 03/04 3:55 PM
STATE COURT CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Progressive Specialty Insurance Company filed by James Williams, III. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 3/4/2025 (hmls)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment
utility Remark - State Court Docs Tue 03/04 3:57 PM
THE ABOVE DOCUMENT (3) IS A COPY OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE COUNTY. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 02/28 3:26 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Lydia Kay Griggsby. Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
2 2 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Thu 02/27 3:23 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Progressive Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Progressive Corporation, Corporate Parent Progressive Agency Holdings, Inc. for Progressive Specialty Insurance Company.(Bailen, Mark)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 02/27 3:12 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore County, Maryland, case number C-03-CV-24-004526. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11810501), filed by Progressive Specialty Insurance Company.(Bailen, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C