New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Steven I Locke
Case #: 2:25-cv-01127
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Feb 27, 2025
Terminated:May 15, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 13, 2025 6:52 AM EDT
Defendant
The Receivable Managment Services, LLC
Represented By
Leisl Bauman Kerechek
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sari Edelman
Represented By
David M. Barshay
Barshay, Rizzo & Lopez, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, May 15, 2025
order Order Dismissing Case Thu 05/15 3:17 PM
Electronic ORDER DISMISSING CASE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), the parties may stipulate to the dismissal of this action with prejudice without a Court order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 5/15/2025. (AGB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
8 8 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 05/14 4:38 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by The Receivable Managment Services, LLC (Kerechek, Leisl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
order Scheduling Order Thu 03/13 10:49 AM
Electronic SCHEDULING ORDER: Based on the representations in DE7 , the parties shall file a stipulation or notice of dismissal on or before May 12, 2025. The conference scheduled for March 19, 2025 is adjourned to May 27, 2025 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 820. If the parties do not consent to this Court's jurisdiction prior to filing their notice or stipulation of dismissal, a district judge will be randomly assigned. See Clerks Notice Re: Consent dated Feb. 28, 2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 3/13/2025. (AGB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Settlement Wed 03/12 4:18 PM
NOTICE of Settlement and Agreed Motion to Vacate Case Dates and Deadlines by The Receivable Managment Services, LLC (Kerechek, Leisl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 03/11 11:20 AM
Electronic ORDER granting DE6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. On consent, Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is extended to and including March 28, 2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 3/11/2025. (AGB)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 03/10 5:47 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by The Receivable Managment Services, LLC. (Kerechek, Leisl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
order Scheduling Order Thu 03/06 11:58 AM
Electronic SCHEDULING ORDER: On consent, the deadline for Defendant to respond to Plaintiffs Motion for Remand is extended to and including March 14, 2025. The initial conference scheduled for April 21, 2025 is advanced to March 19, 2025 at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 820 of the Central Islip Courthouse. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 3/6/2025. (AGB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 03/04 6:08 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to4 MOTION for Hearing re1 Notice of Removal request that Court issue an Order to Show Cause (Unopposed) by The Receivable Managment Services, LLC. (Kerechek, Leisl)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
4 4 motion Hearing Mon 03/03 5:10 PM
MOTION for Hearing re1 Notice of Removal request that Court issue an Order to Show Cause by Sari Edelman. (Barshay, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Scheduling Order Mon 03/03 10:57 AM
INITIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 4/21/2025 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 820 before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 3/3/2025. (KG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 SIL Individual Rules,
Att: 2 Scheduling Order Worksheet
Friday, February 28, 2025
2 2 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Fri 02/28 2:30 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (SMF)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 02/28 2:32 PM
Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (SMF)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Opportunity to Consent Fri 02/28 2:33 PM
Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] (SMF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 02/27 3:58 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by THE RECEIVABLE MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANYEDC-18806396) (Kerechek, Leisl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint