California Central District Court
Judge:Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr
Referred: Alicia G Rosenberg
Case #: 2:25-cv-01715
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:504 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Feb 27, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 13, 2025 4:34 AM PDT
Defendant
Salt Solutions, Inc.
Plaintiff
The Infinite Actuary, LLC
Represented By
Robert D Fish
Fish Ip Law, LLP
contact info
Joseph Aaron Andelin
Fish Ip Law LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, March 03, 2025
11 11 20 pgs order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 03/03 11:36 AM
Standing Order upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (lfa)
Related: [-]
10 10 2 pgs service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 03/03 10:10 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 as to Defendant Salt Solutions, Inc. (car)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 03/03 10:03 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 03/03 10:02 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 03/03 10:02 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (car)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
6 6 1 pgs misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 02/27 5:05 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff The Infinite Actuary, LLC identifying The Infinite Actuary, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Andelin, Joseph)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs misc Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121) Thu 02/27 3:10 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by The Infinite Actuary, LLC. (Andelin, Joseph)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs notice Summons Request Thu 02/27 3:01 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by plaintiff The Infinite Actuary, LLC. (Andelin, Joseph)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 02/27 2:50 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff The Infinite Actuary, LLC, (Andelin, Joseph)
Related: [-]
2 2 3 pgs misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 02/27 2:34 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff The Infinite Actuary, LLC. (Andelin, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 02/27 2:23 PM
COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid (405 paid on 02/27/2025, receipt number 39192574), filed by plaintiff The Infinite Actuary, LLC. (Attorney Joseph Aaron Andelin added to party The Infinite Actuary, LLC(pty:pla))(Andelin, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 3 pgs Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 3 pgs Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 5 pgs Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 6 pgs Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 3 pgs Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 3 pgs Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 15 pgs Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 2 pgs Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 2 pgs Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 2 pgs Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 2 pgs Exhibit 12,
Att: 13 2 pgs Exhibit 13,
Att: 14 18 pgs Exhibit 14,
Att: 15 36 pgs Exhibit 15