Winston v. West American Insurance Company
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Richard F Boulware, II |
Referred: | Daniel J Albregts |
Case #: | 2:25-cv-00373 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 12:635 Breach of Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Feb 27, 2025 |
Case in other court: | Eighth Judicial District Court, A-25-911144-C |
Last checked: Sunday Apr 13, 2025 5:00 AM PDT |
Defendant
West American Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rachel Winston
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, April 14, 2025 | ||
12 | 12
![]() ORDER Granting11 Amended Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 11/19/2025. Motions due by 12/19/2025. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/19/2026. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 4/14/2025.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ) |
|
Friday, April 11, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Amended Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Rachel Winston. (O'Malley, Ryan) |
|
Friday, April 04, 2025 | ||
10 | 10
minord
Minute Order Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order
Fri 04/04 12:29 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 4/4/2025. Re: 9 Joint Stipulated Discovery Plan. The parties' proposed plan seeks longer deadlines than those specified in Local Rule 26-1(b). But the parties fail to request special scheduling review or explain why longer or different time periods should apply as required by Local Rule 26-1(a). So, the Court DENIES the parties' joint stipulated discovery plan (ECF No. 9 ) without prejudice and will require the parties to file a compliant plan on or before April 11, 2025 . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KL) |
|
Thursday, April 03, 2025 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Joint Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Rachel Winston. (O'Malley, Ryan) |
|
Thursday, March 27, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Rachel Winston. (O'Malley, Ryan) |
|
Monday, March 17, 2025 | ||
7 | 7
minord
Minute Order
Mon 03/17 5:06 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 3/17/2025. Re: 6 Notice of FRCP 26(f) Conference. The Court considers the notice of FRCP 26(f) conference to be a discovery paper, which must not be filed with the Court until used in the proceeding, unless the Court orders otherwise. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(d)(1)(A); see LR 26-7. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is kindly directed to STRIKE ECF No. 6 from the docket. See LR IC 7-1. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TG) |
|
Friday, March 14, 2025 | ||
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE of FRCP 26(f) Conference by Rachel Winston. (O'Malley, Ryan) |
|
5 | 5
![]() STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant West American Insurance Company. (Hamilton-Thevenet, Marion) |
|
Thursday, March 13, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Rachel Winston. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (O'Malley, Ryan) |
|
Friday, February 28, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
![]() MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/28/2025. By Deputy Clerk: A. Miller. Statement regarding removed action is due by 3/15/2025. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 3/30/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi) |
|
Thursday, February 27, 2025 | ||
2 | 2
![]() CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by West American Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group for West American Insurance Company added. (Hamilton-Thevenet, Marion) |
|
1 | 1
![]() PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-25-911144-C, (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANVDC-7970173) by West American Insurance Company. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/9/2025. (Hamilton-Thevenet, Marion) |
|
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Fri 02/28 10:40 AM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (AMMi) |