Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Angel Kelley
Case #: 1:25-cv-10479
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Feb 27, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 13, 2025 7:10 AM EDT
Defendant
Alphonse A D'Amico, Sr.
Represented By
Stephen M Larose
Nixon Peabody LLP
contact info
Gina M. McCreadie
Nixon Peabody LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Lancelot Entertainment Boston, LLC
Represented By
Alexandra W Wahl
Wick Phillips
contact info
Aaron D. Rosenberg
Sheehan Phinney Bass & Green, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
29 29 3 pgs misc Declaration Tue 05/06 1:21 PM
DECLARATION re28 Memorandum in Support of Motion,27 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint by Alphonse A D'Amico, Sr.(Larose, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
28 28 21 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Tue 05/06 1:18 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re27 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Alphonse A D'Amico, Sr. (Larose, Stephen)
Related: [-]
27 27 3 pgs motion Dismiss Tue 05/06 1:16 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint by Alphonse A D'Amico, Sr.(Larose, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
26 26 20 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Tue 04/22 7:20 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against Alphonse A D'Amico, Sr, filed by Lancelot Entertainment Boston, LLC.(Rosenberg, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
25 25 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 04/11 8:47 PM
District Judge Angel Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Alphonse A D'Amico, Sr answer due 4/24/2025. (MAL)
Related: [-]
24 24 2 pgs order Order Fri 04/11 8:44 PM
District Judge Angel Kelley: ORDER entered re22 Joint Request for Entry of Agreed Order Entering Parties' Agreement filed by Lancelot Entertainment Boston, LLC.(MAL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
23 23 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 04/10 11:52 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to April 24, 2025 to File Answer re17 Amended Complaint by Lancelot Entertainment Boston, LLC, Alphonse A D'Amico, Sr.(Rosenberg, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
22 22 2 pgs motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 04/04 11:41 AM
MOTION Joint Request for Entry of Agreed Order Entering Parties' Agreement by Lancelot Entertainment Boston, LLC.(Wahl, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
21 21 2 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/25 4:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Gina M. McCreadie on behalf of Alphonse A D'Amico, Sr (McCreadie, Gina)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 03/25 11:19 AM
District Judge Angel Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING 19 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to April 10, 2025 to File Answer to Amended Complaint. Alphonse A D'Amico, Sr. answer due 4/10/2025 (CEH)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
19 19 4 pgs motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 03/24 2:42 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to April 10, 2025 to File Answer to Amended Complaint by Alphonse A D'Amico, Sr.(Larose, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
18 18 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/19 3:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra W Wahl on behalf of Lancelot Entertainment Boston, LLC (Wahl, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
17 17 22 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Thu 03/13 3:16 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Alphonse A D'Amico, Sr, filed by Lancelot Entertainment Boston, LLC.(Wahl, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
16 16 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/12 4:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra W Wahl on behalf of Lancelot Entertainment Boston, LLC (Wahl, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
15 15 2 pgs service Summons Returned Executed Wed 03/05 2:11 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Alphonse A D'Amico, Sr served on 3/4/2025, answer due 3/25/2025. (Rosenberg, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
14 14 notice Notice Cancelling Hearing Tue 03/04 8:32 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. Motion Hearing set for 3/5/2025 is CANCELLED. (MAL)
Related: [-]
13 13 3 pgs order Order on Motion for TRO Tue 03/04 8:28 PM
District Judge Angel Kelley: ORDER re8 Motion for TRO entered. (MAL)
Related: [-]
12 12 2 pgs misc Stipulation Tue 03/04 7:53 PM
STIPULATION re 11 Order,,,, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,,,8 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ex parte and, After Hearing, Preliminary Injunction Joint Request for Entry of Agreed Order and to Cancel Hearing by Lancelot Entertainment Boston, LLC.(Rosenberg, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Text of Proposed Order Ex. 1 - Proposed Order
11 11 order Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 03/04 11:22 AM
District Judge Angel Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re: Plaintiff?s 8 ex parte emergency motion for injunctive relief. An evidentiary hearing is set for Wednesday, March 5, 2025 at 9:00AM in Courtroom 8. Plaintiff, who bears the burden of satisfying the four requirements for injunctive relief: ?(1) a substantial likelihood of success on the merits, (2) a significant risk of irreparable harm if the injunction is withheld, (3) a favorable balance of hardships, and (4) a fit (or lack of friction) between the injunction and the public interest,? Goldstein v. Batista Contracting LLC , 671 F. Supp. 3d 68, 72 (D. Mass. 2023), should be prepared to present evidence at this hearing. In addition, Plaintiff shall send Defendant a copy of this order and notice of hearing no later than 5:00 p.m. today, Tuesday, March 4, 2025. (MAL)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
10 10 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Mon 03/03 11:50 AM
District Judge Angel Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Alexandra Wahl. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number under ADDITIONAL FILER INFORMATION on your form when registering or it will be rejected. Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions [LINK:https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm] . A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (CEH)
Related: [-]
9 9 13 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Mon 03/03 11:29 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support re8 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ex parte and, After Hearing, Preliminary Injunction filed by Lancelot Entertainment Boston, LLC. (Rosenberg, Aaron)
Related: [-]
8 8 5 pgs motion Temporary Restraining Order Mon 03/03 11:26 AM
Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ex parte and, After Hearing, Preliminary Injunction by Lancelot Entertainment Boston, LLC.(Rosenberg, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Text of Proposed Order Ex. 1 - Proposed Order,
Att: 2 5 pgs Affidavit Declaration of Derek Schoettle
Friday, February 28, 2025
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/28 5:19 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Alexandra Wahl Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10865798 by Lancelot Entertainment Boston, LLC.(Rosenberg, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Local Rule Certification
6 6 4 pgs order Order Fri 02/28 2:32 PM
District Judge Angel Kelley: ORDER entered. Standing Order Regarding Motion Practice. (CEH)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs service Summons Issued Fri 02/28 2:22 PM
Summons Issued as to Alphonse A D'Amico, Sr. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (LBO)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Case Assignment Fri 02/28 11:39 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Angel Kelley assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (SEC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
3 3 2 pgs misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 02/27 6:06 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lancelot Entertainment Boston, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Lancelot Entertainment Operation Holdings, LLC for Lancelot Entertainment Boston, LLC.. (Rosenberg, Aaron)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs misc Report on the filing of patent/trademark case Thu 02/27 5:58 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Rosenberg, Aaron)
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 02/27 5:57 PM
COMPLAINT against Alphonse A D'Amico, Sr Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10863534 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Lancelot Entertainment Boston, LLC.(Rosenberg, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Category Form Category Form