Washington Western District Court
Judge:David G Estudillo
Case #: 3:25-cv-05165
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause28:1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Case Filed:Feb 27, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 13, 2025 4:13 AM PDT
Defendant
Pacific Ship Repair & Fabrication Inc
Plaintiff
IBEW Pacific Coast Pension Fund
Represented By
Jane Ewers
Turner Stoeve & Gadliardi Ps
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
10 10 misc Affidavit Wed 04/30 3:44 PM
AFFIDAVIT of K. Wysong Affidavit of Non-Serve by Process Server filed by All Plaintiffs (Ewers, Jane)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
9 9 service Summons Issued Mon 04/07 2:46 PM
Summons(es) Electronically Reissued as to defendant(s) Pacific Ship Repair & Fabrication Inc. (CJS)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Praecipe for a Summons Mon 04/07 2:16 PM
PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by All Plaintiffs (Ewers, Jane)
Related: [-]
7 7 utility Case/IFP Deficiency Letter Mon 04/07 2:05 PM
Notice of Filing Deficiency re5 Amended Document. ***Action Required*** Summons Form Incomplete. See attached letter for more information and instructions. (CJS)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Declaration (non motion) Mon 04/07 1:56 PM
DECLARATION of Due Diligence by Process Server Alesya Petrov re1 Complaint,4 Summons Issued by All Plaintiffs (Ewers, Jane)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Amended Document Mon 04/07 1:47 PM
AMENDMENT Summons to4 Summons Issued by All Plaintiffs (Ewers, Jane)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 03/03 10:54 AM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Pacific Ship Repair & Fabrication Inc. (MW)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
3 3 misc Praecipe for a Summons Fri 02/28 1:52 PM
PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to Defendant Pacific Ship Repair & Fabrication Inc. by Plaintiff IBEW Pacific Coast Pension Fund (Ewers, Jane)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case/IFP Deficiency Letter Fri 02/28 12:58 PM
Notice of Filing Deficiency re1 Complaint,. ***Action Required*** Summons Form Incomplete. See attached letter for more information and instructions. (MW)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 02/28 12:56 PM
U.S. District Judge David G Estudillo added. (MW)
Related: [-]
utility Disclosure Statement - Notice of Deadlines Fri 02/28 3:23 PM
NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1), Plaintiff must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 3/7/2025. If applicable, a Diversity Disclosure Statement may be required pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(2). In order to properly notify the Court, use the event Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement located in CM/ECF under Other Filings, Other Documents.(CDA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 02/27 3:38 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Pacific Ship Repair & Fabrication, Inc. Related [+] Attorney Jane Ewers added to party I.B.E.W. Pacific Coast Pension Fund(pty:pla) filed by I.B.E.W. Pacific Coast Pension Fund.(Ewers, Jane)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8860274
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons