Oregon District Court
Judge:Mustafa T Kasubhai
Case #: 6:25-cv-00333
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Feb 27, 2025
Terminated:Apr 28, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 13, 2025 5:02 AM PDT
Defendant
Blue Moon Fabrics, Inc.
Represented By
John Clarke
Miller Nash LLP
contact info
Joshua M. Sasaki
Miller Nash LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Chet Michael Wilson
Represented By
Andrew Roman Perrong
Perrong Law LLC
contact info
Anthony Paronich
Paronich Law, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, May 05, 2025
10 10 notice Voluntary Dismissal of Case Mon 05/05 6:59 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal . Filed by Chet Michael Wilson. (Perrong, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
9 9 order Dismissal (60-day) - Terminate Case Mon 04/28 11:02 AM
60-DAY ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court having been informed by counsel for the parties that this action has been settled, IT IS ORDERED that, pursuant to LR 41-1, this action is dismissed with prejudice and without costs and with leave, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to have this order of dismissal set aside and the action reinstated if the settlement is not consummated. Pending motions, if any, are denied as moot. All pretrial deadlines and any trial date are stricken. By Clerk of Court Melissa Aubin. (bd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
8 8 notice Settlement Notice Thu 04/24 12:10 PM
Notice of Settlement Filed by Blue Moon Fabrics, Inc.. (Clarke, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
7 7 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition Tue 03/25 2:17 PM
ORDER by Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai GRANTING Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint6 . Defendant must answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by 4/23/2025. (bd)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
6 6 motion Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition Fri 03/21 3:34 PM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint,1 . Filed by Blue Moon Fabrics, Inc.. (Clarke, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
5 5 service Summons/Service Return (All Types) Thu 03/20 1:57 PM
Return of Service Executed as to Blue Moon Fabrics, Inc. served on 3/3/2025, answer due on 3/24/2025. (Perrong, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 02/28 1:16 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Blue Moon Fabrics, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (le)
Related: [-]
3 3 order 3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT Fri 02/28 12:00 PM
Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 6/30/2025. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/28/2025. Pretrial Order is due by 7/28/2025. Ordered by Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (le)
Related: [-]
2 2 5 pgs order Order Fri 02/28 10:45 AM
Case Management Order signed on 02/28/2025 by Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (bd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 02/27 2:49 PM
Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $405 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9760460 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by CHET MICHAEL WILSON against BLUE MOON FABRICS, INC.. (Perrong, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons