New York Southern District Court
Judge:Loretta A Preska
Case #: 1:25-cv-01707
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Feb 27, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 13, 2025 7:03 AM EDT
Defendant
La Prairie, Inc.
Represented By
Evan S Nadel
Kilpatrick Townsend Stockton, LLP
contact info
Robert Nathan Potter
Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP
contact info
Defendant
Laboratoires La Prairie SA
Plaintiff
Caviar Biotec Ltd.
Represented By
Ariel Reinitz
Bochner PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
15 15 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 04/28 11:09 AM
ORDER granting13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint. Defendant La Prairie, Inc. shall respond to the complaint by no later than May 12, 2025. Given potential issues involving foreign law, formal service upon Defendant Laboratoires La Prairie SA is necessary and Defendants' request for an order aligning the deadlines for both Defendants to respond to the complaint is denied. The Clerk of the Court shall close docket number 13. SO ORDERED. La Prairie, Inc. answer due 5/12/2025. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/28/2025) (jjc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
14 14 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 04/24 11:54 PM
LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Ariel Reinitz dated April 24, 2025 re:13 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Evan S. Nadel dated April 21, 2025. . Document filed by Caviar Biotec Ltd.. Related [+]
Related: [-] initz, Ariel
Monday, April 21, 2025
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 04/21 5:14 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Evan S. Nadel dated April 21, 2025. Document filed by La Prairie, Inc., Laboratoires La Prairie SA..(Nadel, Evan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 03/26 11:56 AM
ORDER granting9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint. Defendant's request for a 30 day extension to respond to the Complaint is GRANTED. Defendant's responsive pleading shall be filed no later than April 28, 2025. The Clerk of the Court shall close docket number 9. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/26/2025) La Prairie, Inc. answer due 4/28/2025; Laboratoires La Prairie SA answer due 4/28/2025. (ar)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
11 11 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 03/25 5:35 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Beiersdorf Inc. USA, Other Affiliate LaPrairie.com LLC for La Prairie, Inc.. Document filed by La Prairie, Inc...(Nadel, Evan)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/25 5:30 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Nathan Potter on behalf of La Prairie, Inc...(Potter, Robert)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 03/25 5:26 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Evan S. Nadel dated March 25, 2025. Document filed by La Prairie, Inc...(Nadel, Evan)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/25 5:22 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Evan S Nadel on behalf of La Prairie, Inc...(Nadel, Evan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Thu 03/06 4:39 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. La Prairie, Inc. served on 3/5/2025, answer due 3/26/2025. Document filed by Caviar Biotec Ltd.. Related [+]
Related: [-] initz, Ariel
Friday, February 28, 2025
6 6 service Summons Issued Fri 02/28 9:45 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Laboratoires La Prairie SA. (vf)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 02/28 9:41 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to La Prairie, Inc. (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 02/28 9:33 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Loretta A. Preska. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 02/28 9:34 AM
Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 02/28 9:34 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 02/27 11:05 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Laboratoires La Prairie SA, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Caviar Biotec Ltd.. Related [+]
Related: [-] initz, Ariel
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 02/27 11:04 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to La Prairie, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Caviar Biotec Ltd.. Related [+]
Related: [-] initz, Ariel
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 02/27 10:55 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. Related [+]
Related: [-] initz, Ariel
1 1 15 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 02/27 10:54 PM
COMPLAINT against La Prairie, Inc., Laboratoires La Prairie SA. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30690319)Document filed by Caviar Biotec Ltd.. Related [+]
Related: [-] initz, Ariel