Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Tiffany R Johnson
Case #: 1:25-cv-00985
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance)
Case Filed:Feb 25, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 11, 2025 6:46 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Cannon Executive Protection Agency, LLC
Counter Defendant
Kinsale Insurance Company
Represented By
James Bauer
Fields Howell Llp- Atl
contact info
Paul Lindsey Fields, Jr.
Fields Howell Llp- Atl
contact info
Defendant
Cannon Executive Protection Agency, LLC
In C/O Nkosi Miller 1445 Woodmont Lane NW Suite 1088
Atlanta, GA 30318
Defendant
Kevin Mares
Represented By
Denise Hoying
Law & Moran
contact info
Defendant
Bristol Consulting Group LLC
Defendant
Quality Control Music LLC
Defendant
Shotclock LLC
Defendant
Tactical Elite Protection Services LLC
Plaintiff
Kinsale Insurance Company
Represented By
James Bauer
Fields Howell Llp- Atl
contact info
Paul Lindsey Fields, Jr.
Fields Howell Llp- Atl
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, May 15, 2025
25 25 motion Extension of Time Thu 05/15 11:45 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time file an answer or responsive pleading to Defendant Cannon Executive Protection Agency, LLCs Counterclaim by Kinsale Insurance Company.(Bauer, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Extension of Time
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 05/15 3:18 PM
ORDER by docket entry only granting25 Motion for Extension of Time. Kinsale Insurance Company's deadline to file a response to the Counterclaim is 6/13/25. Signed by Judge Tiffany R Johnson on 5/15/25. (bmr)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/15 3:19 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Cannon Executive Protection Agency, LLC re Order on Motion for Extension of Time. (bmr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
24 24 motion Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Tue 05/06 9:02 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with Brief In Support by Kevin Mares.(Hoying, Denise)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 05/06 11:09 AM
Related: [-]
utility Submission to District Judge Tue 05/06 11:13 AM
Submission of20 Order, Submission Deadline, to District Judge Tiffany R Johnson. (bmr)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
23 23 notice Notice (Other) Fri 04/25 3:18 PM
NOTICE by Kinsale Insurance Company re22 Order, Certificate of Compliance (Bauer, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
22 22 27 pgs order Order Fri 04/18 10:37 AM
GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL IN CIVIL CASES PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE TIFFANY R. JOHNSON. Within seven (7) days of entry of this Order in your case, you are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the attached Certificate of Compliance. (bmr)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Fri 04/18 10:38 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Cannon Executive Protection Agency, LLC re22 Order. (bmr)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 04/14 9:45 AM
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
21 21 motion Extension of Time Fri 04/11 5:20 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading by Kinsale Insurance Company. (Bauer, James)
Related: [-]
20 20 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Fri 04/11 10:03 AM
ORDER: A corporation or organization must be represented by an attorney, and the failure to comply with this rule could result in a default judgment against the client. See LR 83.1(E)(2)(b) (H); see also S.E.C. v. Merch. Cap., LLC, 486 F. Appx 93, 94 n.1 (11th Cir. 2012) (It is well established... that a business organization cannot appear pro se and must be represented by counsel, not merely by a stockholder or officer.). Accordingly, no later than May 2, 2025, CEPA is ORDERED have its attorney enter an appearance in this case. Signed by Judge Tiffany R Johnson on 4/11/2025. (djs)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Fri 04/11 10:05 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Cannon Executive Protection Agency, LLC re20 Order. (djs)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 04/07 3:07 PM
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
19 19 motion Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Fri 04/04 3:08 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, with Brief In Support by Kevin Mares.(Hoying, Denise)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
18 18 service Electronic Summons Issued Tue 04/01 12:04 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Kevin Mares. (jbu)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Electronic Summons Issued Tue 04/01 12:03 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Cannon Executive Protection Agency, LLC. (jbu)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Electronic Summons Issued Tue 04/01 12:03 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Bristol Consulting Group LLC. (jbu)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
14 14 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 03/27 9:23 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Tactical Elite Protection Services LLC. (djs)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 03/27 9:22 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Quality Control Music LLC. (djs)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 03/27 9:22 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Shotclock LLC. (djs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
15 15 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Counterclaim Thu 03/27 11:55 AM
ANSWER to11 Amended Complaint ( Discovery ends on 8/22/2025.) COUNTERCLAIM against Kinsale Insurance Company by Cannon Executive Protection Agency, LLC.(djs)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 03/24 4:26 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Kinsale Insurance Company.(Fields, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Bristol Consulting,
Att: 2 Summons Cannon Executive,
Att: 3 Summons Kevin Mares,
Att: 4 Summons Quality Control,
Att: 5 Summons Shotclock,
Att: 6 Summons Tactical
Thursday, March 20, 2025
10 10 service Affidavit of Service Thu 03/20 11:45 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons Kevin Mares , as to Kevin Mares. (Fields, Paul)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
9 9 service Electronic Summons Issued Wed 03/12 2:45 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Kevin Mares. (djs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Tue 03/11 12:51 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons , as to Cannon Executive Protection Agency. (Fields, Paul)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Proposed Summons Tue 03/11 12:47 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Kinsale Insurance Company Kevin Mares (Fields, Paul)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
6 6 service Electronic Summons Issued Fri 02/28 4:32 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Cannon Executive Protection Agency, LLC. (djs)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Electronic Summons Issued Fri 02/28 4:31 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Kevin Mares. (djs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
4 4 service Proposed Summons Thu 02/27 4:12 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Kinsale Insurance Company Cannon Executive (Fields, Paul)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Proposed Summons Thu 02/27 4:11 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Kinsale Insurance Company Kevin Mares (Fields, Paul)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 02/27 3:07 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kinsale Insurance Company. (Fields, Paul)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
1 1 25 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 02/27 2:39 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Kinsale Insurance Company. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-14097351)(ane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet