Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Amy Totenberg
Case #: 1:25-cv-01007
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Feb 26, 2025
Terminated:Mar 11, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 12, 2025 6:58 AM EDT
Defendant
Greenstone LLC
Defendant
Pfizer Inc.
Defendant
Pharmacia & Upjohn Co. LLC
Defendant
Pharmacia, LLC
Plaintiff
Veletha Belsar
Represented By
N. Kirkland Pope
Pope Mcglamry, P.C.
contact info
Courtney L. Mohammadi
Pope Mcglamry
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
7 7 misc MDL Conditional Transfer Order Tue 03/11 11:38 AM
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-5) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring case to USDC NDFL for inclusion in MDL 3140. (tmf)
Related: [-]
transfer Case Transferred Out - District Transfer Tue 03/11 11:42 AM
Case electronically transferred to USDC NDFL. (tmf)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 03/11 11:45 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (tmf)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Tue 03/11 2:23 PM
New Civil Action in USDC NDFL 3:25-cv-0251 (aar)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
6 6 30+ pgs order Order Thu 03/06 1:57 PM
STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL IN CASES PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE AMY TOTENBERG. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 3/6/2025. (tmf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
5 5 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 02/27 9:31 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Pharmacia, LLC. (cpp)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 02/27 9:30 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Pharmacia & Upjohn Co. LLC. (cpp)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 02/27 9:28 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Pfizer Inc.. (cpp)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 02/27 9:26 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Greenstone LLC. (cpp)
Related: [-]
1 1 65 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 02/27 9:22 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Veletha Belsar. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-14101489)(cpp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet