Maryland District Court
Judge:Matthew J Maddox
Case #: 1:25-cv-00640
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Feb 26, 2025
Terminated:Mar 03, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 12, 2025 6:39 AM EDT
Defendant
Ererik Barron
Defendant
Jason Bend
Defendant
Andrew Genovese
Defendant
Joyce McDonald
Defendant
Kevin Mccan
Defendant
Paul Riley
Defendant
Russel Stoner
Defendant
Darryl Tarver
Defendant
United States
Plaintiff
Nichelle Henson
2515 Robb Street
Baltimore, MD 21218


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, March 03, 2025
5 5 5 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Motion to Stay Mon 03/03 2:21 PM
ORDER Granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Dismissing without prejudice1 Complaint; Denying as Moot3 Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Criminal Trial. Signed by Judge Matthew J. Maddox on 3/3/2025. (c/m 3/3/2025 bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
4 4 misc New Case Notification Letter Thu 02/27 8:53 AM
New Case Notification Letter sent to Nichelle Henson. (c/m 2/27/2025 bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Stay Thu 02/27 8:50 AM
MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Criminal Trial by Nichelle Henson(bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 02/27 8:48 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Nichelle Henson(bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 02/27 8:47 AM
COMPLAINT against Ererik Barron, Jason Bend, Andrew Genovese, Joyce McDonald, Kevin Mccan, Paul Riley, Russel Stoner, Darryl Tarver, United States, filed by Nichelle Henson.(bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons
misc Jury Demand Thu 02/27 8:47 AM
Jury Trial Demand by Nichelle Henson(bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]