Missouri Western District Court
Judge:Stephen R Bough
Case #: 4:25-cv-00140
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Feb 27, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 13, 2025 6:09 AM CDT
Counter Claimant
Commerce Bank
Represented By
Binal J Patel
Banner & Witcoff, Ltd
contact info
Todd W. Ruskamp
Shook, Hardy & Bacon, Llp-Kcmo
contact info
Anna L King
Banner & Witcoff, Ltd
contact info
Counter Defendant
Revenue Management Solutions, LLC
Represented By
Matthew James Elliott
Baty Otto Scheer P.C.-Kcmo
contact info
Katherine M. Surma
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Tyson H. Ketchum
Armstrong Teasdale Llp-Kcmo
contact info
Tyler M. Wood
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Nathaniel C. Love
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Richard L. Brophy
Armstrong Teasdale
contact info
Defendant
Commerce Bank
Represented By
Binal J Patel
Banner & Witcoff, Ltd
contact info
Todd W. Ruskamp
Shook, Hardy & Bacon, Llp-Kcmo
contact info
Anna L King
Banner & Witcoff, Ltd
contact info
Plaintiff
Revenue Management Solutions, LLC
Represented By
Matthew James Elliott
Baty Otto Scheer P.C.-Kcmo
contact info
Katherine M. Surma
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Tyson H. Ketchum
Armstrong Teasdale Llp-Kcmo
contact info
Tyler M. Wood
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Nathaniel C. Love
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Richard L. Brophy
Armstrong Teasdale
contact info
Third Party Defendant
Amy Rinard
Represented By
Katherine M. Surma
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Tyler M. Wood
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Nathaniel C. Love
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Third Party Plaintiff
Commerce Bank
Represented By
Binal J Patel
Banner & Witcoff, Ltd
contact info
Todd W. Ruskamp
Shook, Hardy & Bacon, Llp-Kcmo
contact info
Anna L King
Banner & Witcoff, Ltd
contact info


Docket last updated: 48 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
65 65 discov Certificate of Service Tue 05/06 10:05 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Revenue Management Solutions, LLC filed by Nathaniel C. Love on behalf of Plaintiff Revenue Management Solutions, LLC.(Love, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
64 64 discov Certificate of Service Mon 05/05 5:08 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Commerce Bank filed by Todd W. Ruskamp on behalf of Defendant Commerce Bank, Counter Claimants Commerce Bank, Commerce Bank, Third Party Plaintiff Commerce Bank.(Ruskamp, Todd)
Related: [-]
63 63 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 05/05 1:19 PM
ORDER granting61 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Matthew P. Becker for Commerce Bank allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at [LINK:PACER] . This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
Related: [-]
62 62 discov Certificate of Service Mon 05/05 12:04 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Commerce Bank filed by Todd W. Ruskamp on behalf of Defendant Commerce Bank, Counter Claimants Commerce Bank, Commerce Bank, Third Party Plaintiff Commerce Bank.(Ruskamp, Todd)
Related: [-]
61 61 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 05/05 10:33 AM
Motion to allow Matthew P. Becker to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-9563023) filed by Todd W. Ruskamp on behalf of Commerce Bank. (Ruskamp, Todd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
60 60 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 05/01 3:34 PM
NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Discovery Hearing set for 5/22/2025 at 1:00 PM via Zoom Video Conference before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. A memorandum of the discovery dispute, not to exceed 2 pages in length, should be emailed by each party no later than twenty-four hours prior to the video conference to Tracey Peters at Tracey_Peters@mow.uscourts.gov . Zoom link provided to all parties via email. (Peters, Tracey)
Related: [-]
59 59 minutes Discovery Hearing Thu 05/01 2:46 PM
Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Stephen R. Bough: DISCOVERY HEARING held on 5/1/2025. Order to follow. Discovery hearing to be set for May 22, 2025, at 1:00 p.m. to be held remotely. Counsel appearing for Plaintiff(s): Katherine M. Surma, Nathaniel C. Love and Tyson H. Ketchum. Counsel appearing for Defendant(s): Todd W. Ruskamp, Binal J. Patel and Anna L. King. Time in court: 11:23 a.m. to 12:24 p.m. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Gayle Wambolt, 816-512-5641, gayle_wambolt@mow.uscourts.gov. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Peters, Tracey)
Related: [-]
58 58 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/01 7:26 AM
ORDER granting57 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Brian T. Apel for Commerce Bank allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at [LINK:PACER] . This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
57 57 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/30 1:11 PM
Motion to allow Brian T. Apel to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-9556451) filed by Todd W. Ruskamp on behalf of Commerce Bank. (Ruskamp, Todd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
56 56 respm Suggestions in Opposition to Motion Tue 04/29 9:48 PM
SUGGESTIONS in opposition re48 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Todd W. Ruskamp on behalf of Defendant Commerce Bank. Reply suggestions due by 5/13/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. Related [+] (Ruskamp, Todd)
Related: [-] 48
55 55 cmp Counterclaim Tue 04/29 9:12 PM
Amended COUNTERCLAIM and Amended Third Party Claims against Revenue Management Solutions, LLC, Amy Rinard(Ruskamp, Todd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5