Oklahoma Northern District Court
Case #: 4:25-cr-00052
Case Filed:Feb 25, 2025
Last checked: Friday Feb 28, 2025 1:23 AM CST
Defendant
Dylan Ray Alexander (1)
Represented By
Robert Scott Williams
Northern District Of Oklahoma
contact info
Jacquelyn N. Witt
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Attila Bogdan
Doj-Usao
contact info
Tara Heign
Doj-Usao
contact info
Jafari Scott Dunn
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/28/2025 2:41 AM CST
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT approved by Magistrate Judge Mark T Steele by USA as to Dylan Ray Alexander (1) (cjb, Dpty Clk) [4:25-mj-00087-MTS]
Related: [-]
2 2 WARRANT Issued by Magistrate Judge Mark T Steele as to Dylan Ray Alexander (cjb, Dpty Clk) [4:25-mj-00087-MTS]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
3 3 MOTION for Detention by USA as to Dylan Ray Alexander [Note: Attorney Jafari Scott Dunn added to party USA(pty:pla).] (Dunn, Jafari) [4:25-mj-00087-MTS]
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION for Hearing Related [+] by USA as to Dylan Ray Alexander (Dunn, Jafari) [4:25-mj-00087-MTS]
Related: [-] 3 MOTION for Detention
5 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Tara Heign on behalf of USA [Note: Attorney Tara Heign added to party USA(pty:pla).] (Heign, Tara) [4:25-mj-00087-MTS]
Related: [-]
6 6 MINUTES of Proceedings - held before Magistrate Judge Mark T Steele: Initial Appearance held on 2/5/2025 , ruling on motion(s)/document(s): #4 granted, appointing FPD attorney Robert Scott Williams for Dylan Ray Alexander, setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Detention Hearing set for 2/11/2025 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Mark T Steele, Preliminary Hearing set for 2/11/2025 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Mark T Steele), ordering defendant be detained as to Dylan Ray Alexander Related [+] (Court Reporter: C5) (sdc, Dpty Clk) [4:25-mj-00087-MTS]
Related: [-] 4 MOTION for Hearing
7 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mark T Steele , appointing FPD attorney as to Dylan Ray Alexander (sdc, Dpty Clk) [4:25-mj-00087-MTS]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mark T Steele Ordering defendant be detained pending preliminary and detention hearings , ordering defendant be detained as to Dylan Ray Alexander (sdc, Dpty Clk) [4:25-mj-00087-MTS]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mark T Steele re: Brady as to Dylan Ray Alexander (sdc, Dpty Clk) [4:25-mj-00087-MTS]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
10 10 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney(s) by USA as to Dylan Ray Alexander (Bogdan, Attila) [4:25-mj-00087-MTS]
Related: [-]
11 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE (FPD) by Jacquelyn Witt on behalf of Dylan Ray Alexander (Williams, Robert) Modified on 2/7/2025 to correct docket text (mm, Dpty Clk). [4:25-mj-00087-MTS]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mark T Steele , ruling on motion(s)/document(s): #10 granted Related [+] as to Dylan Ray Alexander (lmt, Dpty Clk) [4:25-mj-00087-MTS]
Related: [-] 10 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney(s)
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
13 13 MINUTES of Proceedings - held before Magistrate Judge Mark T Steele: Detention Hearing held on 2/11/2025 , Preliminary Examination held on 2/11/2025 , ruling on motion(s)/document(s): #3 granted, ordering defendant be detained, striking/terminating deadline(s)/hearing(s) as to Dylan Ray Alexander Related [+] (Court Reporter: c5) (lmt, Dpty Clk) [4:25-mj-00087-MTS]
Related: [-] 3 MOTION for Detention
14 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mark T Steele , ordering defendant be detained as to Dylan Ray Alexander (lmt, Dpty Clk) [4:25-mj-00087-MTS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
15 15 DEFENDANT INFORMATION SHEET(S) by USA as to Dylan Ray Alexander (kjp, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
16 16 INDICTMENT by USA as to Dylan Ray Alexander (1) count(s) 1, 2 (kjp, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
17 17 SEALED UNREDACTED VERSION of Dkt #16 per FRCrP 49.1(f) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]