Colorado District Court
Judge:Philip A Brimmer
Case #: 1:25-cv-00655
Nature of Suit422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158
Cause28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA
Case Filed:Feb 27, 2025
Case in other court:USBC for the District of Colorado, 24-11589-MER
Last checked: Sunday Apr 13, 2025 4:47 AM MDT
Appellant
Abass Yaya Bamba
[E-filer effective 3/26/2025] 995 South Locust St
Denver, CO 80224
Appellee
Dominion Financial Services, LLC
Represented By
Holly R. Shilliday
Mccarthy & Holthus, LLP
contact info
Ilene D. Dell'Acqua
Mccarthy & Holthus, LLP
contact info
In Re
Abass Yaya Bamba
995 South Locust St
Denver, CO 80224
Interested Party
Bankruptcy Appeals - Notice
Interested Party
U.S. Trustee
Interested Party
United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Colorado

GPO Apr 15 2025
ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/15/2025, re: 20 appellant's Emergency Motion to Stay Bankruptcy Court Dismissal Hearing Pending Appeal is DENIED.(dgumb, )
GPO Apr 15 2025
ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/15/2025, re: 11 appellant's Motion for Immediate Sanctions and Court Intervention Against Dominion Financial Services, LLC and its Counsel is DENIED.(dgumb, )
GPO Apr 15 2025
ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/15/2025, re: 8 appellant's Letter Re: Request for Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel is DENIED. ORDERED that appellant's Supplemental Motion to Compel Disclosure of Legal Fee Arrangements and Ensure Fair Litigation Balance in Support of Request for Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel [Docket No. 10] is DENIED.(dgumb, )

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
38 38 notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/24 9:11 AM
DUE DATE: Appellee's brief due 5/16/2025 for Appellee Dominion Financial Services, LLC. (mmaha, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
37 37 appeal Appellants Reply Brief Mon 04/21 3:47 PM
Appellant's REPLY BRIEF by Appellant Abass Yaya Bamba(Bamba, Abass)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Notice Event,
Att: 2 Memorandum Of Law Notice of Event,
Att: 3 Bankruptcy Minute Order
36 36 appeal Appellants Reply Brief Mon 04/21 11:52 AM
Appellant's REPLY BRIEF by Appellant Abass Yaya Bamba(Bamba, Abass)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Appendix in Support of the Stay Proceeding,
Att: 2 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of the Stay Proceeding
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
35 35 appeal Appellants Opening Brief Wed 04/16 4:25 PM
Appellant's OPENING BRIEF by Appellant Abass Yaya Bamba(Bamba, Abass)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Appendix Volume I,
Att: 2 Appendix Appendix Volume II,
Att: 3 Appendix Appendix Volume III
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
34 34 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Appoint Pro Bono Counsel Tue 04/15 4:04 PM
ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/15/2025, re:8 appellant's Letter Re: Request for Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel is DENIED. ORDERED that appellant's Supplemental Motion to Compel Disclosure of Legal Fee Arrangements and Ensure Fair Litigation Balance in Support of Request for Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel [Docket No.10 ] is DENIED .(dgumb, )
Related: [-]
33 33 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Sanctions Tue 04/15 4:02 PM
ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/15/2025, re:11 appellant's Motion for Immediate Sanctions and Court Intervention Against Dominion Financial Services, LLC and its Counsel is DENIED .(dgumb, )
Related: [-]
32 32 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Tue 04/15 4:00 PM
ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/15/2025, re:20 appellant's Emergency Motion to Stay Bankruptcy Court Dismissal Hearing Pending Appeal is DENIED .(dgumb, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
31 31 2 pgs order Order Thu 04/03 3:29 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/3/2025. The opening brief and appendix filed by Appellant on April 2, 2025, do not comply with the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and 10th Cir. BAP Local Rules as follows. Accordingly, it is HEREBY ORDERED that this appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute unless Appellant cures the deficiencies described above by filing and serving a compliant amended opening brief and amended appendix by April 16, 2025. [Please read attached Notice for more details] (dgumb, )
Related: [-]
30 30 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave Thu 04/03 9:33 AM
ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/3/2025, re:22 Motion for Leave to File Late Statement of Issues on Appeal and Request for ECF Filing Access is GRANTED. ORDERED that appellant Abass Bamba shall file his statement of issues and designation of record with the Bankruptcy Court on or before April 9, 2025. ORDERED that appellant's brief and appendix shall be filed and served on or before April 16, 2025. ORDERED that appellee's brief, if any, is due thirty (30) days from the date that appellant's brief and appendix are filed and served pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P.8018(a)(2).(dgumb, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
29 29 appeal Appellants Opening Brief Wed 04/02 4:00 PM
Appellant's OPENING BRIEF by Appellee Dominion Financial Services, LLC(Bamba, Abass)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix,
Att: 2 Certificate of Compliance,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Friday, March 28, 2025
28 28 appeal Appellants Reply Brief Fri 03/28 7:39 PM
Appellant's REPLY BRIEF by Appellee Dominion Financial Services, LLC (Bamba, Abass)
Related: [-]
27 27 respm Response to Motion Fri 03/28 5:58 PM
RESPONSE to22 MOTION for Leave to filed by Appellee Dominion Financial Services, LLC. (Shilliday, Holly)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
26 26 appeal Appellants Reply Brief Thu 03/27 4:58 PM
Appellant's REPLY BRIEF by Appellee Dominion Financial Services, LLC(Bamba, Abass)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Continuation of Main Document,
Att: 2 Continuation of Main Document
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
25 25 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Wed 03/26 10:08 PM
BRIEF in Opposition to20 MOTION to Stay filed by Appellee Dominion Financial Services, LLC.(Shilliday, Holly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Order Overruling Objection,
Att: 2 Exhibit Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 3 Exhibit Bankruptcy Court Docket,
Att: 4 Exhibit Claims Register
24 24 misc Pro Se E-Filing Privileges Granted Wed 03/26 1:58 PM
NOTICE OF PRO SE E-FILING PRIVILEGES: Appellant, Abass Yaya Bamba, sought and received e-filing privileges on 3/26/2025. All further service will be effectuated electronically via CM/ECF to the email address of record.(Text Only Entry) (lrobe)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
23 23 notice Notice (Other) Fri 03/21 3:29 PM
DUE DATE: Response to Appellant Abass Bamba's Motion for Leave to File Late Statement of Issues on Appeal and Request for ECF Filing Access due 03/28/2025 for Appellee Dominion Financial Services, LLC. (mmaha, )
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Leave Fri 03/21 9:31 AM
Motion For Leave To File Late Statement Of Issues On Appeal And Request For ECF Filing Access by Appellant Abass Yaya Bamba.(dgumb, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement of Issues On Appeal,
Att: 2 Designation of Record On Appeal
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
21 21 order Minute Order Wed 03/19 12:23 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/19/2025 re:20 Emergency Motion to Stay Bankruptcy Court Dismissal Hearing Pending Appeal. Appellee Dominion Financial Services, LLC shall file a response on or before March 26, 2024 . Text Only Entry (pabsec, )
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Stay Wed 03/19 9:23 AM
Emergency Motion To Stay Bankruptcy Court Dismissal Hearing Pending Appeal by Appellant Abass Yaya Bamba.(dgumb, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
19 19 respm Brief in Support of Motion Tue 03/18 8:57 AM
Reply In Support Of8 Letter re: Request for Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel filed by Appellant Abass Yaya Bamba.(dgumb, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, March 17, 2025
18 18 respm Brief in Support of Motion Mon 03/17 12:47 PM
Appellant's Reply In Support Of11 MOTION FOR IMMEDIATE SANCTIONS AND COURT INTERVENTION AGAINST DOMINION FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC AND ITS COUNSEL filed by Appellant Abass Yaya Bamba.(dgumb, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit
Friday, March 14, 2025
17 17 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Fri 03/14 6:00 PM
BRIEF in Opposition to11 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Appellee Dominion Financial Services, LLC. (Shilliday, Holly)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Fri 03/14 11:45 AM
DUE DATE: Reply to Response to Appellant's Motion to Appoint Pro Bono Counsel due 03/21/2025 for Appellant Abass Yaya Bamba. (bleon,)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
15 15 misc Statement Thu 03/13 6:20 PM
STATEMENT of Admission to Practice; Interested Parties and Regarding Oral Argument Combined by Appellee Dominion Financial Services, LLC. (Shilliday, Holly)
Related: [-]
14 14 respm Response to Motion Thu 03/13 6:15 PM
RESPONSE to8 MOTION to Appoint Pro Bono Counsel filed by Appellee Dominion Financial Services, LLC.(Shilliday, Holly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Motion to Withdraw,
Att: 2 Exhibit Order Allowing Claim
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Thu 03/13 4:11 PM
NOTICE: Notice of Deficiency sent to Appellant Abass Yaya Bamba. Response due 03/27/2025 for Appellant Abass Yaya Bamba. (bleon,)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Fri 03/07 1:33 PM
DUE DATE: Response to Appellant Abass Bamba's Motion for Sanctions11 due 03/14/2025 for Appellee Dominion Financial Services, LLC. (azolt, )
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Sanctions Fri 03/07 10:44 AM
MOTION FOR IMMEDIATE SANCTIONS AND COURT INTERVENTION AGAINST DOMINION FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC AND ITS COUNSEL by Appellant Abass Yaya Bamba.(dgumb, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
10 10 respm Brief in Support of Motion Fri 03/07 9:15 AM
BRIEF in Support of8 Letter re: Request for Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel filed by Appellant Abass Yaya Bamba. (dgumb, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Thu 03/06 3:21 PM
DUE DATE: Appellee Dominion Financial Services, LLC's Response to Appellant Abass Bamba's Construed Motion to Appoint Pro Bono Counsel8 due 3/13/2025. (azolt, ) Modified on 3/6/2025 to correct docket text (agarc, )
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Appoint Pro Bono Counsel Thu 03/06 12:14 PM
Letter re: Request for Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel by Appellant Abass Yaya Bamba. (dgumb, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
7 7 misc Statement Tue 03/04 9:15 AM
STATEMENT OF INTERESTED PARTIES by In Re Abass Yaya Bamba, Appellant Abass Yaya Bamba. (dgumb, )
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Statement Tue 03/04 9:14 AM
STATEMENT OF PRO SE STATUS by In Re Abass Yaya Bamba, Appellant Abass Yaya Bamba. (dgumb, )
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Statement Tue 03/04 9:13 AM
STATEMENT REGARDING ORAL ARGUMENT by In Re Abass Yaya Bamba, Appellant Abass Yaya Bamba. (dgumb, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
4 4 appeal Letter re Bankruptcy Appeal Mon 03/03 2:39 PM
CASE OPENING SCHEDULING LETTER: The above captioned case was entered on the docket on 02/28/2025 and assigned the case number referenced above. Statement of Admission or Pro Se Status, Statement of Interested Parties, and Statement Regarding Oral Argument due 03/17/2025 for Appellant Abass Bamba and Appellee Dominion Financial Services, LLC. Appellant's brief and appendix due 04/02/2025 for Appellant Abass Bamba.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief and Appendix Checklist (azolt,
3 3 misc Filing Fee Received Mon 03/03 2:31 PM
FEES: The appeal filing fee has been paid. Receipt number: 315244. (azolt, )
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
1 1 misc Case Assigned to Judge Fri 02/28 9:06 AM
Case assigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Text Only Entry. (echa, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
2 2 appeal Bankruptcy Appeal Fri 02/28 4:02 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT filed by Appellant Abass Bamba. Record received from the Bankruptcy Court 02/27/2025. Designation of Record and Statement of Issues due to clerk of Bankruptcy Court by 03/12/2025 for Appellant Abass Bamba. (bleon, )
Related: [-]