Consolidated
Lead case: 2:23-md-03080

New Jersey District Court
Judge:Brian R Martinotti
Referred: Rukhsanah L Singh
Case #: 2:25-cv-01548
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Feb 28, 2025
Case in other court:Massachusetts, 1:25-cv-10370
Last checked: Monday Apr 14, 2025 5:16 AM EDT
Defendant
EVERNORTH HEALTH INC.
Defendant
Zinc Health Ventures, L.L.C.
Defendant
ZINC HEALTH SERVICES LLC
Defendant
UnitedHealth Group Inc
Defendant
SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. L.L.C.
Defendant
OptumInsight Inc.
Defendant
OPTUMRX INC.
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC.
Defendant
MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.
Defendant
Express Scripts Inc.
1 Express Way
St. Louis, MO 63121
Represented By
Charles L. Solomont
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Defendant
EXPRESS SCRIPTS PHARMACY INC.
Represented By
Charles L. Solomont
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Defendant
EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS LLC.
Defendant
ESI MAIL PHARMACY SERVICE INC.
Represented By
Charles L. Solomont
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Defendant
EMISAR PHARMA SERVICES LLC
Defendant
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
Defendant
CVS PHARMACY INC.
Defendant
CVS HEALTH CORPORATION
Defendant
CAREMARKPCS HEALTH LLC
Represented By
Payal Salsburg
Laredo, Smith & Kane, LLP
contact info
Marc Charles Laredo
Laredo, Smith & Kane, LLP
contact info
Mark D Smith
Laredo, Smith & Kane, LLP
contact info
Defendant
CAREMARK RX L.L.C.
Defendant
CAREMARK L.L.C.
Defendant
Ascent Health Services LLC
In Re
INSULIN PRICING LITIGATION
Plaintiff
COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS
Represented By
WILLIAM LISTON, III
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info
TANYA DEARMAN ELLIS
Forman Watkins & Krutz, LLP
contact info
Michael William Wong
Massachusetts Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Ethan W. Marks
Massachusetts Office Of The Attorney General
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Thursday, April 17, 2025
48 48 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 04/17 2:18 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS. (LISTON, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
47 47 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 04/17 2:18 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS. (LISTON, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
46 46 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 04/17 2:17 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS. (LISTON, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
45 45 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 04/17 2:16 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS. (LISTON, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
44 44 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 04/17 2:15 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS. (LISTON, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
43 43 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 04/17 2:14 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS. (LISTON, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
42 42 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 04/17 2:14 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS. (LISTON, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
41 41 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 04/17 2:13 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS. (LISTON, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
40 40 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 04/17 2:12 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS. (LISTON, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
39 39 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 04/17 2:11 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS. (LISTON, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
38 38 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 04/17 2:10 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS. (LISTON, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
37 37 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 04/17 2:09 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS. (LISTON, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
36 36 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 04/17 2:08 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS. (LISTON, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
35 35 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 04/17 2:07 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS. (LISTON, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
34 34 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 04/17 2:07 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS. (LISTON, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
33 33 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 04/17 2:06 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS. (LISTON, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
32 32 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/17 2:04 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS. (LISTON, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
31 31 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/17 2:03 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS. (LISTON, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
30 30 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/17 2:03 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS. (LISTON, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
29 29 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/17 2:02 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS. (LISTON, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
28 28 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/17 2:01 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS. (LISTON, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
27 27 service Summons Issued Wed 04/02 12:03 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ascent Health Services LLC, CAREMARK L.L.C., CAREMARK RX L.L.C., CAREMARKPCS HEALTH LLC, CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, CVS PHARMACY INC., ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, EMISAR PHARMA SERVICES LLC, ESI MAIL PHARMACY SERVICE INC., EVERNORTH HEALTH INC., EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS LLC., EXPRESS SCRIPTS PHARMACY INC., Express Scripts Inc., INSULIN PRICING LITIGATION, MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC., NOVO NORDISK INC., OPTUMRX INC., OptumInsight Inc., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. L.L.C., UnitedHealth Group Inc, ZINC HEALTH SERVICES LLC, Zinc Health Ventures, L.L.C.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (krg, )
Related: [-]
26 26 service Summons - Request for Issue Wed 04/02 10:45 AM
Request for Summons to be Issued by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS as to Zinc Health Ventures, L.L.C.. (LISTON, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
25 25 service Summons - Request for Issue Wed 04/02 10:44 AM
Request for Summons to be Issued by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS as to ZINC HEALTH SERVICES LLC. (LISTON, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
24 24 service Summons - Request for Issue Wed 04/02 10:43 AM
Request for Summons to be Issued by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS as to UnitedHealth Group Inc. (LISTON, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
23 23 service Summons - Request for Issue Wed 04/02 10:42 AM
Request for Summons to be Issued by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS as to SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. L.L.C.. (LISTON, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
22 22 service Summons - Request for Issue Wed 04/02 10:40 AM
Request for Summons to be Issued by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS as to OPTUMRX INC.. (LISTON, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
21 21 service Summons - Request for Issue Wed 04/02 10:39 AM
Request for Summons to be Issued by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS as to OptumInsight Inc.. (LISTON, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
20 20 service Summons - Request for Issue Wed 04/02 10:39 AM
Request for Summons to be Issued by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS as to NOVO NORDISK INC.. (LISTON, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
19 19 service Summons - Request for Issue Wed 04/02 10:38 AM
Request for Summons to be Issued by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS as to EMISAR PHARMA SERVICES LLC. (LISTON, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Summons - Request for Issue Wed 04/02 10:37 AM
Request for Summons to be Issued by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS as to CVS PHARMACY INC.. (LISTON, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Summons - Request for Issue Wed 04/02 10:35 AM
Request for Summons to be Issued by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS as to CVS HEALTH CORPORATION. (LISTON, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Summons - Request for Issue Wed 04/02 10:34 AM
Request for Summons to be Issued by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS as to CAREMARKPCS HEALTH LLC. (LISTON, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Summons - Request for Issue Wed 04/02 10:33 AM
Request for Summons to be Issued by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS as to CAREMARK RX L.L.C.. (LISTON, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons - Request for Issue Wed 04/02 10:32 AM
Request for Summons to be Issued by COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS as to CAREMARK L.L.C.. (LISTON, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/01 5:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM LISTON, III on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS (LISTON, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/28 11:12 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by TANYA DEARMAN ELLIS on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS (ELLIS, TANYA)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
11 11 mdl MDL Notice to Counsel Fri 02/28 12:40 PM
Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (krg, )
Related: [-]
10 10 transfer Case Transferred In - District Court Transfer Fri 02/28 12:24 PM
Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Massachusetts; Case Number 1:25-cv-10370. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
9 9 mdl MDL Transfer Order (out) Fri 02/28 12:10 PM
Case transferred to the District of New Jersey pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order entered by the MDL Panel on 2/27/2025. Case file electronically extracted to the Clerk in that district. (Danieli, Chris)
Related: [-]
8 8 transfer Case Transferred In - District Court Transfer Fri 02/28 12:08 PM
Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 24 in MDL Case 3080 received from District of District of New Jersey requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings (Danieli, Chris)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 02/28 12:25 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. (krg, )
Related: [-]
Pursuant to a transfer order entered in MDL No. 3080 on 2/27/2025, District of Massachusetts case number 1 25-10370 has been transferred to the District of New Jersey and assigned civil action number: 2 25-1548 In Re: Insulin Pricing Litigation, MDL 3080 (krg, ) Modified on 2/28/2025 (krg, ).
Related: [-]
order Case Management Order Fri 02/28 12:36 PM
This case is part of MDL 3080. Parties are expected to review and abide by all prior orders entered in this MDL, which can be found[LINK:here] . (krg, )
Related: [-]
mdl MDL Direct File Fri 02/28 12:29 PM
Pursuant to a transfer order entered in MDL No. 3080 on 2/27/2025, District of Massachusetts case number 1 25-10370 has been transferred to the District of New Jersey and assigned civil action number: 2 25-1548 In Re: Insulin Pricing Litigation, MDL 3080 (krg, ) Modified on 2/28/2025 (krg, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
7 7 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc, ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10840773 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid)(Solomont, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E
6 6 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. Counsel who filed an appearance in this case prior to its removal must refer to[LINK:Local Rule 83.5.3(f)] Practice by Persons Not Members of the Bar on how to proceed as an attorney in this court. General Information for Attorneys can be found[LINK:here] . (NMC)
Related: [-]
5 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (JAM)
Related: [-]
4 4 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet re 3 Notice (Other),2 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet by CaremarkPCS Health, LLC. (Salsburg, Payal)
Related: [-]
3 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Local Category Form. The form can be found on the court's website under Resources/Local Forms. Counsel will use the event under Other Documents - Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet. (NMC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
2 2 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet by CaremarkPCS Health, LLC. (Salsburg, Payal) Modified on 2/13/2025 (NMC).
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CaremarkPCS Health, LLC ( Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10838478 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid)(Salsburg, Payal) Modified on 2/13/2025 (NMC).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit