California Central District Court
Case #: 8:25-mc-00006
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
CauseCivil Miscellaneous Case
Case Filed:Feb 28, 2025
Terminated:Mar 03, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of New Case Number / Judge Assignment (CV-15) - optional html form Tue 04/22 10:12 AM
NOTICE of New Case Number and Judge Assignment by Clerk. This case is hereby converted from case type MC to case type CV because subsequent filings have changed the nature of the case. A new case number has therefore been assigned to this case. District Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth are assigned to this new case number. All future documents must be filed under the new case number, which is 8:25-cv-00835 TJH (ADSx). The previous case number, 8:25-mc-00006-UA, is hereby terminated. (car)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
9 9 2 pgs motion Order Tue 04/15 4:10 PM
REQUEST for Order for Appointing Registered Process Server to Serve Writs of Execution filed by Respondents Advantage Sales & Marketing Inc., Advantage Sales & Marketing LLC, Advantage Solutions Inc., Karman Intermediate Corp., Karman Topco L.P.. (Greenberg, Alan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Appointing Registered Process Server to Serve Writs of Execution
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
8 8 misc Writ of Execution - Issued Thu 03/27 5:20 PM
Writ of Execution issued against Petruss Media Group, LLC f/k/a Take 5 Media Group LLC, RJV Marketing Corp., Richard Gluck, and Alexander Radetich re: Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution7 . (gk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
7 7 misc Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution Tue 03/25 9:54 AM
Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution filed by Respondents Advantage Sales & Marketing Inc., Advantage Sales & Marketing LLC, Advantage Solutions Inc., Karman Intermediate Corp., Karman Topco L.P..(Greenberg, Alan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Writ of Execution
Friday, March 21, 2025
6 6 notice Deficiency - Writ of Execution (CV-52c) - optional html form Fri 03/21 11:10 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE WRIT OF EXECUTION. The document is being returned to you for correction of: It appears that Doc Nos. 3-5 are the same. Judgment debtors have prepared the Affidavit and Request Form CV-24, and a state court Writ of Execution form, and should have used the District Court Form CV-23. On Form CV-24, please input at least the name of one Judgment Creditor and Judgment Debtor before indicating "See Attachment." At any space with a dollar sign, please indicate an amount or "0.00." (gk)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
5 5 misc Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution Fri 03/14 3:20 PM
Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution filed by Respondents Advantage Sales & Marketing LLC, Advantage Sales & Marketing Inc., Karman Intermediate Corp., Advantage Solutions Inc., Karman Topco L.P..(Greenberg, Alan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Writ of Execution
4 4 misc Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution Fri 03/14 3:19 PM
Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution filed by Respondents Advantage Sales & Marketing LLC, Advantage Sales & Marketing Inc., Karman Intermediate Corp., Advantage Solutions Inc., Karman Topco L.P..(Greenberg, Alan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Writ of Execution
3 3 misc Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution Fri 03/14 3:17 PM
Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution filed by Respondents Advantage Sales & Marketing LLC, Advantage Sales & Marketing Inc., Karman Intermediate Corp., Advantage Solutions Inc., Karman Topco L.P..(Greenberg, Alan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Writ of Execution
Friday, February 28, 2025
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Fri 02/28 2:44 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Evan Christopher Borges counsel for Respondents Advantage Sales & Marketing LLC, Advantage Sales & Marketing Inc., Karman Intermediate Corp., Advantage Solutions Inc., Karman Topco L.P.. Adding Evan C. Borges as counsel of record for Judgment Creditors/Respondents Advantage Sales & Marketing LLC, Advantage Sales & Marketing Inc., Karman Intermediate Corp., Advantage Solutions Inc., and Karman Topco, L.P. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Judgment Creditors/Respondents Advantage Sales & Marketing LLC, Advantage Sales & Marketing Inc., Karman Intermediate Corp., Advantage Solutions Inc., and Karman Topco, L.P.. (Attorney Evan Christopher Borges added to party Advantage Sales & Marketing LLC(pty:res), Attorney Evan Christopher Borges added to party Advantage Sales & Marketing Inc.(pty:res), Attorney Evan Christopher Borges added to party Karman Intermediate Corp.(pty:res), Attorney Evan Christopher Borges added to party Advantage Solutions Inc.(pty:res), Attorney Evan Christopher Borges added to party Karman Topco L.P.(pty:res))(Borges, Evan)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp MISC - Registration of Judgment from Another District (AO-451) Fri 02/28 10:47 AM
REGISTRATION OF JUDGMENT FROM ANOTHER DISTRICT Receipt No: ACACDC-39199616 - Fee: $52, filed by Respondents Karman Intermediate Corp., Advantage Sales & Marketing Inc., Advantage Sales & Marketing LLC, Advantage Solutions Inc., Karman Topco L.P.. (Attorney Alan Greenberg added to party Advantage Sales & Marketing LLC(pty:res), Attorney Alan Greenberg added to party Advantage Sales & Marketing Inc.(pty:res), Attorney Alan Greenberg added to party Karman Intermediate Corp.(pty:res), Attorney Alan Greenberg added to party Advantage Solutions Inc.(pty:res), Attorney Alan Greenberg added to party Karman Topco L.P.(pty:res))(Greenberg, Alan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Judgment