North Carolina Western District Court
Judge:Frank D Whitney
Referred: Susan C Rodriguez
Case #: 3:25-cv-00150
Nature of Suit150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Feb 28, 2025
Case in other court:Mecklenburg, 25CV004975-590
Last checked: Monday Apr 14, 2025 4:58 AM EDT
Defendant
Maestro Health, LLC
Represented By
E. Garrison White
Offit Kurman, PA
contact info
Robert B. McNeill
Offit Kurman, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Marpai, Inc.
Represented By
E. Garrison White
Offit Kurman, PA
contact info
Robert B. McNeill
Offit Kurman, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Messer Financial Group Inc.
Represented By
Pearson G. Cost
Brooks, Pierce, Mclendon, Humphrey & Leonard, LLP
contact info
Jeffrey E. Oleynik
Brooks, Pierce, Mclendon, Humphrey & Leonard
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
9 9 order Scheduling Order Thu 05/01 3:43 PM
Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: Three (3) days. Discovery due by 10/9/2025. Motions due by 11/6/2025. Mediation deadline set for 10/23/2025. Jury Trial set for 3/2/2026 09:01 AM in Courtroom #5B, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Frank D Whitney. Signed by Senior Judge Frank D Whitney on 5/1/2025. (tlj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 04/15 4:09 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Messer Financial Group Inc.. (Cost, Pearson)
Related: [-]
7 7 discov Certification of Initial Attorneys Conference and Discovery Plan Tue 04/15 4:07 PM
CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Cost, Pearson)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 03/28 2:18 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Motion to Dismiss by Maestro Health, LLC, Marpai, Inc..(McNeill, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
5 5 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 03/06 3:11 PM
ORDER granting Defendant's 4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Maestro Health, LLC answer due 3/28/2025; Marpai, Inc. answer due 3/28/2025. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez on 03/06/2025. (cjs)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Extension of Time Thu 03/06 2:02 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint by MARPAI, INC., Maestro Health, LLC. (McNeill, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, March 03, 2025
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 03/03 8:40 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by MARPAI, INC.. (McNeill, Robert)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 03/03 8:36 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Maestro Health, LLC. (McNeill, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 02/28 12:04 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Mecklenburg County Superior Court, case number 25CV004975-590. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCWDC-6869879), filed by Maestro Health, LLC.(McNeill, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Civil Summons,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Removal
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 02/28 1:46 PM
Case assigned to Senior Judge Frank D Whitney and US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the[LINK:Case Assignment Packet] . This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (add)
Related: [-]
utility Initial Scheduling Order Entry - Judge Whitney Fri 02/28 1:47 PM
Clerk's Entry and Service of[LINK:Initial Scheduling Order] and[LINK:Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form] pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (add)
Related: [-]
utility Standing Order Regarding Use of Artificial Intelligence Fri 02/28 1:47 PM
Standing Order Regarding Use of Artificial Intelligence (3:24-mc-104). Click on this link to retrieve the Standing Order (add)
Related: [-]